Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor

CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Thompson, Mike [D-CA-5]* 02/04/2013
Rep. Davis, Rodney [R-IL-13] 03/04/2013
Rep. Stivers, Steve [R-OH-15] 03/13/2013
Rep. Amodei, Mark E. [R-NV-2] 04/09/2013
Rep. Doggett, Lloyd [D-TX-35] 04/09/2013
Rep. Tiberi, Patrick J. [R-OH-12] 04/09/2013
Rep. Connolly, Gerald E. [D-VA-11] 05/07/2013
Rep. Roe, David P. [R-TN-1] 06/12/2013
Rep. Lowenthal, Alan S. [D-CA-47] 10/03/2013
Rep. Schakowsky, Janice D. [D-IL-9] 03/24/2014