Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor

CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Sherman, Brad [D-CA-30]* 02/04/2013
Rep. Waxman, Henry A. [D-CA-33]* 02/04/2013
Rep. Hahn, Janice [D-CA-44] 02/06/2013
Rep. Cardenas, Tony [D-CA-29] 03/15/2013
Rep. Bass, Karen [D-CA-37] 04/18/2013
Rep. Lowenthal, Alan S. [D-CA-47] 10/15/2013