Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor

CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Bonamici, Suzanne [D-OR-1]* 02/04/2013
Rep. Christensen, Donna M. [D-VI-At Large]* 02/04/2013
Rep. Cicilline, David N. [D-RI-1]* 02/04/2013
Rep. Conyers, John, Jr. [D-MI-13]* 02/04/2013
Rep. DeLauro, Rosa L. [D-CT-3]* 02/04/2013
Rep. Edwards, Donna F. [D-MD-4]* 02/04/2013
Rep. Ellison, Keith [D-MN-5]* 02/04/2013
Rep. Eshoo, Anna G. [D-CA-18]* 02/04/2013
Rep. Holt, Rush [D-NJ-12]* 02/04/2013
Rep. Honda, Michael M. [D-CA-17]* 02/04/2013
Rep. Huffman, Jared [D-CA-2]* 02/04/2013
Rep. Israel, Steve [D-NY-3]* 02/04/2013
Rep. Langevin, James R. [D-RI-2]* 02/04/2013
Rep. Larsen, Rick [D-WA-2]* 02/04/2013
Rep. Lofgren, Zoe [D-CA-19]* 02/04/2013
Rep. McCollum, Betty [D-MN-4]* 02/04/2013
Rep. Moore, Gwen [D-WI-4]* 02/04/2013
Rep. Norton, Eleanor Holmes [D-DC-At Large]* 02/04/2013
Rep. Pingree, Chellie [D-ME-1]* 02/04/2013
Rep. Polis, Jared [D-CO-2]* 02/04/2013
Rep. Sanchez, Linda T. [D-CA-38]* 02/04/2013
Rep. Schwartz, Allyson Y. [D-PA-13]* 02/04/2013
Rep. Tsongas, Niki [D-MA-3]* 02/04/2013
Rep. Van Hollen, Chris [D-MD-8]* 02/04/2013
Rep. Wasserman Schultz, Debbie [D-FL-23]* 02/04/2013
Rep. Waters, Maxine [D-CA-43]* 02/04/2013
Rep. Waxman, Henry A. [D-CA-33]* 02/04/2013
Rep. Yarmuth, John A. [D-KY-3]* 02/04/2013
Rep. Dingell, John D. [D-MI-12] 02/05/2013
Rep. Peters, Gary C. [D-MI-14] 02/05/2013
Rep. Price, David E. [D-NC-4] 02/05/2013
Rep. Butterfield, G. K. [D-NC-1] 02/06/2013
Rep. Carson, Andre [D-IN-7] 02/15/2013
Rep. Sires, Albio [D-NJ-8] 02/15/2013
Rep. McIntyre, Mike [D-NC-7] 02/15/2013
Rep. McGovern, James P. [D-MA-2] 02/15/2013
Rep. Moran, James P. [D-VA-8] 02/15/2013
Rep. Blumenauer, Earl [D-OR-3] 04/11/2013
Rep. Lee, Barbara [D-CA-13] 04/11/2013
Rep. Rangel, Charles B. [D-NY-13] 04/11/2013
Rep. Jackson Lee, Sheila [D-TX-18] 05/23/2013
Rep. Napolitano, Grace F. [D-CA-32] 06/03/2013
Rep. Davis, Susan A. [D-CA-53] 06/03/2013
Rep. Connolly, Gerald E. [D-VA-11] 06/17/2013
Rep. Maloney, Carolyn B. [D-NY-12] 06/17/2013
Rep. Takano, Mark [D-CA-41] 07/18/2013
Rep. Crowley, Joseph [D-NY-14] 07/18/2013
Rep. Schakowsky, Janice D. [D-IL-9] 09/20/2013
Rep. Grijalva, Raul M. [D-AZ-3] 09/20/2013
Rep. Cohen, Steve [D-TN-9] 10/09/2013
Rep. Brown, Corrine [D-FL-5] 10/29/2013
Rep. Bishop, Timothy H. [D-NY-1] 10/29/2013
Rep. Smith, Adam [D-WA-9] 10/29/2013
Rep. Wilson, Frederica S. [D-FL-24] 10/30/2013
Rep. Payne, Donald M., Jr. [D-NJ-10] 10/30/2013
Rep. Peterson, Collin C. [D-MN-7] 10/30/2013
Rep. Capps, Lois [D-CA-24] 11/12/2013
Rep. Clarke, Yvette D. [D-NY-9] 11/12/2013
Rep. Hastings, Alcee L. [D-FL-20] 11/13/2013
Rep. Tonko, Paul [D-NY-20] 11/13/2013
Rep. Negrete McLeod, Gloria [D-CA-35] 01/08/2014
Rep. Hinojosa, Ruben [D-TX-15] 01/08/2014
Rep. Gutierrez, Luis V. [D-IL-4] 01/27/2014
Rep. Bishop, Sanford D., Jr. [D-GA-2] 01/27/2014
Rep. Capuano, Michael E. [D-MA-7] 01/27/2014
Rep. Schiff, Adam B. [D-CA-28] 01/27/2014
Rep. Brady, Robert A. [D-PA-1] 01/27/2014
Rep. Hahn, Janice [D-CA-44] 01/27/2014
Rep. Sherman, Brad [D-CA-30] 01/27/2014
Rep. DelBene, Suzan K. [D-WA-1] 01/28/2014
Rep. Deutch, Theodore E. [D-FL-21] 01/28/2014
Rep. Cleaver, Emanuel [D-MO-5] 01/28/2014
Rep. Lewis, John [D-GA-5] 01/28/2014
Rep. Loebsack, David [D-IA-2] 01/28/2014
Rep. Nolan, Richard M. [D-MN-8] 01/29/2014
Rep. Shea-Porter, Carol [D-NH-1] 01/29/2014
Rep. Chu, Judy [D-CA-27] 02/03/2014
Rep. Titus, Dina [D-NV-1] 02/03/2014
Rep. Farr, Sam [D-CA-20] 02/03/2014
Rep. Meng, Grace [D-NY-6] 02/03/2014
Rep. Doggett, Lloyd [D-TX-35] 02/03/2014
Rep. Bustos, Cheri [D-IL-17] 02/03/2014
Rep. Murphy, Patrick [D-FL-18] 02/03/2014
Rep. Pocan, Mark [D-WI-2] 02/03/2014
Rep. Courtney, Joe [D-CT-2] 02/03/2014
Rep. Matsui, Doris O. [D-CA-6] 02/03/2014
Rep. Tierney, John F. [D-MA-6] 02/03/2014
Rep. Meeks, Gregory W. [D-NY-5] 02/03/2014
Rep. Maffei, Daniel B. [D-NY-24] 02/03/2014
Rep. Higgins, Brian [D-NY-26] 02/03/2014
Rep. Sarbanes, John P. [D-MD-3] 02/03/2014
Rep. Neal, Richard E. [D-MA-1] 02/03/2014
Rep. Velazquez, Nydia M. [D-NY-7] 02/03/2014
Rep. Bass, Karen [D-CA-37] 02/03/2014
Rep. Delaney, John K. [D-MD-6] 02/03/2014
Rep. Fudge, Marcia L. [D-OH-11] 02/03/2014
Rep. Gabbard, Tulsi [D-HI-2] 02/03/2014
Rep. Lowenthal, Alan S. [D-CA-47] 02/03/2014
Rep. Peters, Scott H. [D-CA-52] 02/03/2014
Rep. Quigley, Mike [D-IL-5] 02/04/2014
Rep. Vargas, Juan [D-CA-51] 02/04/2014
Rep. Swalwell, Eric [D-CA-15] 02/04/2014
Rep. Kilmer, Derek [D-WA-6] 02/04/2014
Rep. Frankel, Lois [D-FL-22] 02/04/2014
Rep. Cartwright, Matt [D-PA-17] 02/04/2014
Rep. Brownley, Julia [D-CA-26] 02/04/2014
Rep. Grayson, Alan [D-FL-9] 02/04/2014
Rep. Kildee, Daniel T [D-MI-5] 02/04/2014
Rep. Veasey, Marc A. [D-TX-33] 02/05/2014
Rep. Thompson, Mike [D-CA-5] 02/06/2014
Rep. Nadler, Jerrold [D-NY-10] 02/06/2014
Rep. Johnson, Henry C. "Hank," Jr. [D-GA-4] 02/06/2014
Rep. Speier, Jackie [D-CA-14] 02/11/2014
Rep. Himes, James A. [D-CT-4] 02/11/2014
Rep. Garamendi, John [D-CA-3] 03/13/2014