Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor

CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Scalise, Steve [R-LA-1] 01/22/2013
Rep. Long, Billy [R-MO-7] 01/22/2013
Rep. Gohmert, Louie [R-TX-1] 01/22/2013
Rep. Jordan, Jim [R-OH-4] 01/22/2013
Rep. Pittenger, Robert [R-NC-9] 01/22/2013
Rep. LaMalfa, Doug [R-CA-1] 01/22/2013
Rep. Lamborn, Doug [R-CO-5] 01/22/2013
Rep. Culberson, John Abney [R-TX-7] 01/22/2013
Rep. Posey, Bill [R-FL-15] 01/22/2013
Rep. Price, Tom [R-GA-6] 01/22/2013
Rep. Fleming, John [R-LA-4] 01/22/2013
Rep. Messer, Luke [R-IN-6] 01/22/2013
Rep. Mulvaney, Mick [R-SC-5] 01/22/2013
Rep. Westmoreland, Lynn A. [R-GA-3] 02/06/2013
Rep. Jones, Walter B., Jr. [R-NC-3] 02/06/2013
Rep. McClintock, Tom [R-CA-4] 02/06/2013
Rep. Hensarling, Jeb [R-TX-5] 02/06/2013
Rep. Salmon, Matt [R-AZ-1] 02/06/2013
Rep. Franks, Trent [R-AZ-2] 02/06/2013
Rep. Burgess, Michael C. [R-TX-26] 02/06/2013
Rep. Chabot, Steve [R-OH-1] 02/06/2013
Rep. Brooks, Mo [R-AL-5] 02/06/2013
Rep. Perry, Scott [R-PA-4] 02/06/2013
Rep. Cotton, Tom [R-AR-4] 02/06/2013
Rep. Harris, Andy [R-MD-1] 02/06/2013
Rep. Marchant, Kenny [R-TX-24] 02/06/2013
Rep. Mullin, Markwayne [R-OK-2] 02/06/2013
Rep. Rice, Tom [R-SC-7] 02/06/2013
Rep. Flores, Bill [R-TX-17] 02/06/2013
Rep. Rokita, Todd [R-IN-4] 02/06/2013
Rep. Kingston, Jack [R-GA-1] 02/06/2013
Rep. Poe, Ted [R-TX-2] 02/13/2013
Rep. Wenstrup, Brad R. [R-OH-2] 02/13/2013
Rep. Barr, Andy [R-KY-6] 02/13/2013
Rep. Broun, Paul C. [R-GA-10] 02/13/2013
Rep. Goodlatte, Bob [R-VA-6] 03/12/2013
Rep. Hartzler, Vicky [R-MO-4] 03/12/2013
Rep. Roe, David P. [R-TN-1] 03/12/2013
Rep. Bridenstine, Jim [R-OK-1] 03/12/2013
Rep. Massie, Thomas [R-KY-4] 03/12/2013
Rep. Carter, John R. [R-TX-31] 03/21/2013
Rep. DeSantis, Ron [R-FL-6] 03/21/2013
Rep. Collins, Doug [R-GA-9] 05/06/2013
Rep. Crawford, Eric A. "Rick" [R-AR-1] 05/06/2013
Rep. Sessions, Pete [R-TX-32] 05/06/2013
Rep. Schweikert, David [R-AZ-5] 05/08/2013
Rep. Shuster, Bill [R-PA-9] 05/08/2013
Rep. Duncan, Jeff [R-SC-3] 05/08/2013
Rep. Radel, Trey [R-FL-19] 05/08/2013
Rep. Thornberry, Mac [R-TX-13] 05/08/2013
Rep. Hall, Ralph M. [R-TX-4] 05/08/2013
Rep. Gingrey, Phil [R-GA-11] 05/08/2013
Rep. Conaway, K. Michael [R-TX-11] 05/08/2013
Rep. Holding, George [R-NC-13] 05/08/2013
Rep. Rogers, Harold [R-KY-5] 05/08/2013
Rep. McKinley, David B. [R-WV-1] 05/08/2013
Rep. Cramer, Kevin [R-ND-At Large] 05/08/2013
Rep. Walberg, Tim [R-MI-7] 05/08/2013
Rep. Simpson, Michael K. [R-ID-2] 05/08/2013
Rep. Garrett, Scott [R-NJ-5] 05/08/2013
Rep. Yoho, Ted S. [R-FL-3] 05/08/2013
Rep. Johnson, Sam [R-TX-3] 05/08/2013
Rep. Neugebauer, Randy [R-TX-19] 05/08/2013
Rep. Yoder, Kevin [R-KS-3] 05/08/2013
Rep. Bishop, Rob [R-UT-1] 05/08/2013
Rep. Graves, Tom [R-GA-9] 05/08/2013
Rep. Stewart, Chris [R-UT-2] 05/08/2013
Rep. Southerland, Steve II [R-FL-2] 05/08/2013
Rep. Huizenga, Bill [R-MI-2] 05/08/2013
Rep. Daines, Steve [R-MT-At Large] 05/08/2013
Rep. Weber, Randy K. Sr. [R-TX-14] 05/08/2013
Rep. Olson, Pete [R-TX-22] 05/08/2013
Rep. Barton, Joe [R-TX-6] 05/08/2013
Rep. Latta, Robert E. [R-OH-5] 05/08/2013
Rep. Huelskamp, Tim [R-KS-1] 05/08/2013
Rep. Campbell, John [R-CA-48] 05/08/2013
Rep. Woodall, Rob [R-GA-7] 05/08/2013
Rep. Grimm, Michael G. [R-NY-13] 05/08/2013
Rep. Williams, Roger [R-TX-25] 05/08/2013
Rep. Amash, Justin [R-MI-3] 05/08/2013
Rep. Hudson, Richard [R-NC-8] 05/08/2013
Rep. Labrador, Raul R. [R-ID-1] 05/08/2013
Rep. Fleischmann, Charles J. "Chuck" [R-TN-3] 05/13/2013
Rep. Lummis, Cynthia M. [R-WY-At Large] 05/13/2013
Rep. Wagner, Ann [R-MO-2] 05/13/2013
Rep. Fincher, Stephen Lee [R-TN-8] 05/13/2013
Rep. Pearce, Stevan [R-NM-2] 05/13/2013
Rep. Gibbs, Bob [R-OH-18] 05/13/2013
Rep. Davis, Rodney [R-IL-13] 05/13/2013
Rep. Farenthold, Blake [R-TX-27] 05/13/2013
Rep. Bentivolio, Kerry L. [R-MI-11] 05/13/2013
Rep. Bilirakis, Gus M. [R-FL-9] 05/13/2013
Rep. Kinzinger, Adam [R-IL-11] 05/13/2013
Rep. Duncan, John J., Jr. [R-TN-2] 05/13/2013
Rep. Kline, John [R-MN-2] 05/13/2013
Rep. Coble, Howard [R-NC-6] 05/13/2013
Rep. Meadows, Mark [R-NC-11] 05/13/2013
Rep. DesJarlais, Scott [R-TN-4] 05/13/2013
Rep. Blackburn, Marsha [R-TN-7] 05/13/2013
Rep. Terry, Lee [R-NE-2] 05/13/2013
Rep. Joyce, David P. [R-OH-14] 05/13/2013
Rep. Palazzo, Steven M. [R-MS-4] 05/13/2013
Rep. McCaul, Michael T. [R-TX-10] 05/13/2013
Rep. Rothfus, Keith J. [R-PA-12] 05/13/2013
Rep. Johnson, Bill [R-OH-6] 05/13/2013
Rep. Nunnelee, Alan [R-MS-1] 05/13/2013
Rep. Wilson, Joe [R-SC-2] 05/14/2013
Rep. Guthrie, Brett [R-KY-2] 05/14/2013
Rep. Lankford, James [R-OK-5] 05/14/2013
Rep. Jenkins, Lynn [R-KS-2] 05/14/2013
Rep. Miller, Jeff [R-FL-1] 05/14/2013
Rep. Stockman, Steve [R-TX-9] 05/14/2013
Rep. Gowdy, Trey [R-SC-4] 05/14/2013
Rep. Smith, Lamar [R-TX-21] 05/14/2013
Rep. Benishek, Dan [R-MI-1] 05/14/2013
Rep. Hurt, Robert [R-VA-5] 05/14/2013
Rep. Walorski, Jackie [R-IN-2] 05/14/2013
Rep. Reed, Tom [R-NY-29] 05/14/2013
Rep. Ellmers, Renee L. [R-NC-2] 05/14/2013
Rep. Calvert, Ken [R-CA-44] 05/14/2013
Rep. Granger, Kay [R-TX-12] 05/14/2013
Rep. Miller, Candice S. [R-MI-10] 05/14/2013
Rep. Bonner, Jo [R-AL-1] 05/14/2013
Rep. Stutzman, Marlin A. [R-IN-3] 05/15/2013
Rep. Lucas, Frank D. [R-OK-3] 05/15/2013
Rep. Scott, Austin [R-GA-8] 05/15/2013
Rep. Pompeo, Mike [R-KS-4] 05/16/2013
Rep. Wittman, Robert J. [R-VA-1] 05/16/2013