Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor

CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Cotton, Tom [R-AR-4] 02/06/2013
Rep. Massie, Thomas [R-KY-4] 03/19/2013
Rep. Bishop, Rob [R-UT-1] 07/09/2013
Rep. Smith, Adrian [R-NE-3] 07/16/2013
Rep. Barletta, Lou [R-PA-11] 07/17/2013
Rep. Pompeo, Mike [R-KS-4] 09/09/2013
Rep. Young, Todd C. [R-IN-9] 09/09/2013
Rep. Hartzler, Vicky [R-MO-4] 01/08/2014