Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor

CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Collins, Doug [R-GA-9]* 02/11/2014
Rep. Conyers, John, Jr. [D-MI-13]* 02/11/2014
Rep. Rush, Bobby L. [D-IL-1]* 02/11/2014
Rep. Norton, Eleanor Holmes [D-DC-At Large]* 02/11/2014
Rep. Nadler, Jerrold [D-NY-10]* 02/11/2014
Rep. Clay, Wm. Lacy [D-MO-1]* 02/11/2014
Rep. Jackson Lee, Sheila [D-TX-18]* 02/11/2014
Rep. Meeks, Gregory W. [D-NY-5]* 02/11/2014
Rep. Hahn, Janice [D-CA-44]* 02/11/2014
Rep. Rangel, Charles B. [D-NY-13]* 02/11/2014
Rep. Beatty, Joyce [D-OH-3]* 02/11/2014
Rep. Cohen, Steve [D-TN-9]* 02/11/2014
Rep. Pitts, Joseph R. [R-PA-16]* 02/11/2014
Rep. Hinojosa, Ruben [D-TX-15]* 02/11/2014
Rep. Grijalva, Raul M. [D-AZ-3]* 02/11/2014
Rep. Butterfield, G. K. [D-NC-1]* 02/11/2014
Rep. Carson, Andre [D-IN-7]* 02/11/2014
Rep. Tonko, Paul [D-NY-20]* 02/11/2014
Rep. Dingell, John D. [D-MI-12]* 02/11/2014
Rep. Sewell, Terri A. [D-AL-7]* 02/11/2014
Rep. Cummings, Elijah E. [D-MD-7]* 02/11/2014
Rep. Brown, Corrine [D-FL-5]* 02/11/2014
Rep. Lee, Barbara [D-CA-13]* 02/11/2014
Rep. Christensen, Donna M. [D-VI-At Large]* 02/11/2014
Rep. Moore, Gwen [D-WI-4]* 02/11/2014
Rep. Hastings, Alcee L. [D-FL-20]* 02/11/2014
Rep. Wilson, Frederica S. [D-FL-24]* 02/11/2014
Rep. Edwards, Donna F. [D-MD-4]* 02/11/2014
Rep. Waters, Maxine [D-CA-43]* 02/11/2014
Rep. Schakowsky, Janice D. [D-IL-9]* 02/11/2014
Rep. Blumenauer, Earl [D-OR-3]* 02/11/2014
Rep. Davis, Danny K. [D-IL-7]* 02/11/2014
Rep. Bishop, Sanford D., Jr. [D-GA-2]* 02/11/2014
Rep. Van Hollen, Chris [D-MD-8]* 02/11/2014
Rep. Payne, Donald M., Jr. [D-NJ-10]* 02/11/2014
Rep. Ellison, Keith [D-MN-5]* 02/11/2014
Rep. Fattah, Chaka [D-PA-2]* 02/11/2014
Rep. Richmond, Cedric L. [D-LA-2]* 02/11/2014
Rep. Kelly, Robin L. [D-IL-2]* 02/11/2014
Rep. Bass, Karen [D-CA-37]* 02/11/2014
Rep. Gutierrez, Luis V. [D-IL-4]* 02/11/2014
Rep. Clarke, Yvette D. [D-NY-9]* 02/11/2014
Rep. Veasey, Marc A. [D-TX-33]* 02/11/2014
Rep. Thompson, Bennie G. [D-MS-2]* 02/11/2014
Rep. Clyburn, James E. [D-SC-6]* 02/11/2014
Rep. Eshoo, Anna G. [D-CA-18]* 02/11/2014
Rep. Kaptur, Marcy [D-OH-9]* 02/11/2014
Rep. Fudge, Marcia L. [D-OH-11]* 02/11/2014
Rep. Johnson, Eddie Bernice [D-TX-30]* 02/11/2014
Rep. Jeffries, Hakeem S. [D-NY-8]* 02/11/2014
Rep. Chu, Judy [D-CA-27] 02/18/2014
Rep. McGovern, James P. [D-MA-2] 02/18/2014
Rep. DelBene, Suzan K. [D-WA-1] 02/18/2014
Rep. Levin, Sander M. [D-MI-9] 02/18/2014
Rep. Scott, Robert C. "Bobby" [D-VA-3] 02/25/2014
Rep. Enyart, William L. [D-IL-12] 02/25/2014
Rep. Horsford, Steven A. [D-NV-4] 02/25/2014
Rep. Cicilline, David N. [D-RI-1] 02/25/2014
Rep. McNerney, Jerry [D-CA-9] 02/25/2014
Rep. Green, Al [D-TX-9] 02/25/2014
Rep. Cleaver, Emanuel [D-MO-5] 02/25/2014
Rep. Scott, David [D-GA-13] 02/25/2014
Rep. Sires, Albio [D-NJ-8] 02/25/2014
Rep. Roybal-Allard, Lucille [D-CA-40] 02/25/2014
Rep. Speier, Jackie [D-CA-14] 02/25/2014
Rep. Waxman, Henry A. [D-CA-33] 02/25/2014
Rep. DeGette, Diana [D-CO-1] 02/25/2014
Rep. Smith, Adam [D-WA-9] 02/25/2014
Rep. Pocan, Mark [D-WI-2] 02/26/2014
Rep. Farr, Sam [D-CA-20] 02/26/2014
Rep. Quigley, Mike [D-IL-5] 02/26/2014
Rep. Peters, Gary C. [D-MI-14] 02/26/2014
Rep. McDermott, Jim [D-WA-7] 02/26/2014
Rep. Honda, Michael M. [D-CA-17] 03/04/2014
Rep. Kuster, Ann M. [D-NH-2] 03/06/2014
Rep. Moran, James P. [D-VA-8] 03/13/2014
Rep. Swalwell, Eric [D-CA-15] 03/13/2014
Rep. Deutch, Theodore E. [D-FL-21] 03/27/2014