Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor

CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Smith, Lamar [R-TX-21]* 02/06/2014
Rep. Hall, Ralph M. [R-TX-4]* 02/06/2014
Rep. Broun, Paul C. [R-GA-10]* 02/06/2014
Rep. Culberson, John Abney [R-TX-7]* 02/06/2014
Rep. Bridenstine, Jim [R-OK-1]* 02/06/2014
Rep. Lummis, Cynthia M. [R-WY-At Large]* 02/06/2014
Rep. Rohrabacher, Dana [R-CA-48]* 02/06/2014
Rep. Collins, Chris [R-NY-27]* 02/06/2014
Rep. Burgess, Michael C. [R-TX-26]* 02/06/2014
Rep. Olson, Pete [R-TX-22]* 02/06/2014
Rep. Cramer, Kevin [R-ND-At Large]* 02/06/2014
Rep. Bucshon, Larry [R-IN-8]* 02/06/2014
Rep. Hultgren, Randy [R-IL-14]* 02/06/2014
Rep. Neugebauer, Randy [R-TX-19]* 02/06/2014
Rep. Palazzo, Steven M. [R-MS-4]* 02/06/2014
Rep. Brooks, Mo [R-AL-5]* 02/06/2014
Rep. Salmon, Matt [R-AZ-5]* 02/06/2014
Rep. Franks, Trent [R-AZ-8]* 02/06/2014
Rep. Gosar, Paul A. [R-AZ-4] 02/11/2014
Rep. Weber, Randy K. Sr. [R-TX-14] 02/11/2014
Rep. LaMalfa, Doug [R-CA-1] 02/11/2014
Rep. Mullin, Markwayne [R-OK-2] 02/11/2014
Rep. Duncan, Jeff [R-SC-3] 02/18/2014
Rep. Griffith, H. Morgan [R-VA-9] 02/18/2014
Rep. Westmoreland, Lynn A. [R-GA-3] 02/25/2014
Rep. Lamborn, Doug [R-CO-5] 02/25/2014
Rep. Nunnelee, Alan [R-MS-1] 02/26/2014
Rep. Fincher, Stephen Lee [R-TN-8] 02/27/2014
Rep. Garrett, Scott [R-NJ-5] 02/27/2014
Rep. Sessions, Pete [R-TX-32] 02/27/2014
Rep. Fortenberry, Jeff [R-NE-1] 02/27/2014
Rep. Kelly, Mike [R-PA-3] 02/27/2014
Rep. McHenry, Patrick T. [R-NC-10] 02/27/2014
Rep. Mulvaney, Mick [R-SC-5] 02/28/2014
Rep. Meadows, Mark [R-NC-11] 02/28/2014
Rep. McMorris Rodgers, Cathy [R-WA-5] 03/04/2014
Rep. Schock, Aaron [R-IL-18] 03/10/2014
Rep. Hartzler, Vicky [R-MO-4] 03/12/2014
Rep. Kline, John [R-MN-2] 03/24/2014
Rep. Flores, Bill [R-TX-17] 03/27/2014
Rep. Barton, Joe [R-TX-6] 03/27/2014
Rep. DeSantis, Ron [R-FL-6] 04/02/2014
Rep. Forbes, J. Randy [R-VA-4] 04/04/2014