Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor

CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Wagner, Ann [R-MO-2]* 01/28/2014
Rep. Rangel, Charles B. [D-NY-13]* 01/28/2014
Rep. Conyers, John, Jr. [D-MI-13]* 01/28/2014
Rep. Kelly, Robin L. [D-IL-2]* 01/28/2014
Rep. Wilson, Frederica S. [D-FL-24]* 01/28/2014
Rep. Dent, Charles W. [R-PA-15] 02/03/2014
Rep. Ryan, Tim [D-OH-13] 02/18/2014
Rep. Norton, Eleanor Holmes [D-DC-At Large] 02/21/2014
Rep. Kaptur, Marcy [D-OH-9] 02/25/2014
Rep. McGovern, James P. [D-MA-2] 02/26/2014
Rep. Bass, Karen [D-CA-37] 02/26/2014
Rep. Bishop, Sanford D., Jr. [D-GA-2] 02/26/2014
Rep. Brown, Corrine [D-FL-5] 02/26/2014
Rep. Butterfield, G. K. [D-NC-1] 02/26/2014
Rep. Carson, Andre [D-IN-7] 02/26/2014
Rep. Christensen, Donna M. [D-VI-At Large] 02/26/2014
Rep. Clarke, Yvette D. [D-NY-9] 02/26/2014
Rep. Clay, Wm. Lacy [D-MO-1] 02/26/2014
Rep. Cleaver, Emanuel [D-MO-5] 02/26/2014
Rep. Clyburn, James E. [D-SC-6] 02/26/2014
Rep. Cummings, Elijah E. [D-MD-7] 02/26/2014
Rep. Davis, Danny K. [D-IL-7] 02/26/2014
Rep. Edwards, Donna F. [D-MD-4] 02/26/2014
Rep. Fudge, Marcia L. [D-OH-11] 02/26/2014
Rep. Green, Al [D-TX-9] 02/26/2014
Rep. Hastings, Alcee L. [D-FL-20] 02/26/2014
Rep. Horsford, Steven A. [D-NV-4] 02/26/2014
Rep. Jackson Lee, Sheila [D-TX-18] 02/26/2014
Rep. Jeffries, Hakeem S. [D-NY-8] 02/26/2014
Rep. Johnson, Eddie Bernice [D-TX-30] 02/26/2014
Rep. Johnson, Henry C. "Hank," Jr. [D-GA-4] 02/26/2014
Rep. Lee, Barbara [D-CA-13] 02/26/2014
Rep. Lewis, John [D-GA-5] 02/26/2014
Rep. Meeks, Gregory W. [D-NY-5] 02/26/2014
Rep. Moore, Gwen [D-WI-4] 02/26/2014
Rep. Payne, Donald M., Jr. [D-NJ-10] 02/26/2014
Rep. Richmond, Cedric L. [D-LA-2] 02/26/2014
Rep. Scott, Robert C. "Bobby" [D-VA-3] 02/26/2014
Rep. Sewell, Terri A. [D-AL-7] 02/26/2014
Rep. Thompson, Bennie G. [D-MS-2] 02/26/2014
Rep. Veasey, Marc A. [D-TX-33] 02/26/2014
Rep. Waters, Maxine [D-CA-43] 02/26/2014
Rep. Ellison, Keith [D-MN-5] 03/11/2014
Rep. Speier, Jackie [D-CA-14] 03/11/2014
Rep. Brady, Robert A. [D-PA-1] 03/24/2014
Rep. Hinojosa, Ruben [D-TX-15] 03/24/2014