Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor

CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Hartzler, Vicky [R-MO-4]* 01/27/2014
Rep. Rahall, Nick J., II [D-WV-3]* 01/27/2014
Rep. Miller, Candice S. [R-MI-10]* 01/27/2014
Rep. Perry, Scott [R-PA-4]* 01/27/2014
Rep. Bishop, Rob [R-UT-1]* 01/27/2014
Rep. Franks, Trent [R-AZ-8]* 01/27/2014
Rep. Enyart, William L. [D-IL-12]* 01/27/2014
Rep. Barr, Andy [R-KY-6]* 01/27/2014
Rep. Rothfus, Keith J. [R-PA-12]* 01/27/2014
Rep. Simpson, Michael K. [R-ID-2]* 01/27/2014
Rep. Cole, Tom [R-OK-4]* 01/27/2014
Rep. Chaffetz, Jason [R-UT-3]* 01/27/2014
Rep. Runyan, Jon [R-NJ-3]* 01/27/2014
Rep. Cramer, Kevin [R-ND-At Large]* 01/27/2014
Rep. Matheson, Jim [D-UT-4]* 01/27/2014
Rep. Barber, Ron [D-AZ-2]* 01/27/2014
Rep. Nugent, Richard B. [R-FL-11] 01/28/2014
Rep. Stewart, Chris [R-UT-2] 01/28/2014
Rep. Hanabusa, Colleen W. [D-HI-1] 01/28/2014
Rep. Stivers, Steve [R-OH-15] 01/28/2014
Rep. Walz, Timothy J. [D-MN-1] 01/28/2014
Rep. Crenshaw, Ander [R-FL-4] 01/28/2014
Rep. Dent, Charles W. [R-PA-15] 01/28/2014
Rep. Luetkemeyer, Blaine [R-MO-3] 01/28/2014
Rep. Griffin, Tim [R-AR-2] 01/28/2014
Rep. Hunter, Duncan D. [R-CA-50] 01/28/2014
Rep. Graves, Sam [R-MO-6] 02/03/2014
Rep. Latham, Tom [R-IA-3] 02/03/2014
Rep. Capito, Shelley Moore [R-WV-2] 02/03/2014
Rep. Carney, John C., Jr. [D-DE-At Large] 02/03/2014
Rep. Bentivolio, Kerry L. [R-MI-11] 02/03/2014
Rep. Green, Gene [D-TX-29] 02/03/2014
Rep. Peterson, Collin C. [D-MN-7] 02/03/2014
Rep. Tiberi, Patrick J. [R-OH-12] 02/03/2014
Rep. Schrader, Kurt [D-OR-5] 02/04/2014
Rep. Fincher, Stephen Lee [R-TN-8] 02/04/2014
Rep. Michaud, Michael H. [D-ME-2] 02/04/2014
Rep. McKinley, David B. [R-WV-1] 02/04/2014
Rep. Latta, Robert E. [R-OH-5] 02/04/2014
Rep. LoBiondo, Frank A. [R-NJ-2] 02/04/2014
Rep. Rooney, Thomas J. [R-FL-17] 02/04/2014
Rep. Blackburn, Marsha [R-TN-7] 02/04/2014
Rep. Calvert, Ken [R-CA-42] 02/05/2014
Rep. Fortenberry, Jeff [R-NE-1] 02/05/2014
Rep. Noem, Kristi L. [R-SD-At Large] 02/05/2014
Rep. Bachmann, Michele [R-MN-6] 02/05/2014
Rep. Gerlach, Jim [R-PA-6] 02/05/2014
Rep. Brownley, Julia [D-CA-26] 02/05/2014
Rep. Crawford, Eric A. "Rick" [R-AR-1] 02/05/2014
Rep. Chabot, Steve [R-OH-1] 02/05/2014
Rep. Womack, Steve [R-AR-3] 02/05/2014
Rep. DesJarlais, Scott [R-TN-4] 02/05/2014
Rep. Lummis, Cynthia M. [R-WY-At Large] 02/10/2014
Rep. McAllister, Vance M. [R-LA-5] 02/10/2014
Rep. Johnson, Bill [R-OH-6] 02/10/2014
Rep. Duncan, John J., Jr. [R-TN-2] 02/10/2014
Rep. Gabbard, Tulsi [D-HI-2] 02/10/2014
Rep. Rogers, Mike J. [R-MI-8] 02/10/2014
Rep. Kuster, Ann M. [D-NH-2] 02/10/2014
Rep. Jones, Walter B., Jr. [R-NC-3] 02/10/2014
Rep. Paulsen, Erik [R-MN-3] 02/10/2014
Rep. Ryan, Tim [D-OH-13] 02/11/2014
Rep. McCollum, Betty [D-MN-4] 02/11/2014
Rep. Walorski, Jackie [R-IN-2] 02/11/2014
Rep. Lamborn, Doug [R-CO-5] 02/11/2014
Rep. Huizenga, Bill [R-MI-2] 02/11/2014
Rep. Brooks, Susan W. [R-IN-5] 02/11/2014
Rep. King, Steve [R-IA-4] 02/11/2014
Rep. Coffman, Mike [R-CO-6] 02/11/2014
Rep. Sewell, Terri A. [D-AL-7] 02/11/2014
Rep. Welch, Peter [D-VT-At Large] 02/11/2014
Rep. Terry, Lee [R-NE-2] 02/11/2014
Rep. Stockman, Steve [R-TX-36] 02/21/2014
Rep. Pittenger, Robert [R-NC-9] 02/21/2014
Rep. Bucshon, Larry [R-IN-8] 02/21/2014
Rep. Young, Todd C. [R-IN-9] 02/21/2014
Rep. Roe, David P. [R-TN-1] 02/21/2014
Rep. Weber, Randy K. Sr. [R-TX-14] 02/21/2014
Rep. Young, Don [R-AK-At Large] 02/21/2014
Rep. Diaz-Balart, Mario [R-FL-25] 02/21/2014
Rep. McIntyre, Mike [D-NC-7] 02/21/2014
Rep. Duffy, Sean P. [R-WI-7] 02/21/2014
Rep. Gowdy, Trey [R-SC-4] 02/21/2014
Rep. Walberg, Tim [R-MI-7] 02/21/2014
Rep. Stutzman, Marlin A. [R-IN-3] 02/21/2014
Rep. Massie, Thomas [R-KY-4] 02/21/2014
Rep. Meadows, Mark [R-NC-11] 02/21/2014
Rep. LaMalfa, Doug [R-CA-1] 02/21/2014
Rep. Ross, Dennis A. [R-FL-15] 02/21/2014
Rep. Pingree, Chellie [D-ME-1] 02/21/2014
Rep. Messer, Luke [R-IN-6] 02/21/2014
Rep. Beatty, Joyce [D-OH-3] 02/21/2014
Rep. Nolan, Richard M. [D-MN-8] 02/25/2014
Rep. Hudson, Richard [R-NC-8] 02/25/2014
Rep. Schwartz, Allyson Y. [D-PA-13] 02/25/2014
Rep. Gohmert, Louie [R-TX-1] 02/25/2014
Rep. Lowenthal, Alan S. [D-CA-47] 02/25/2014
Rep. Duncan, Jeff [R-SC-3] 02/25/2014
Rep. Schock, Aaron [R-IL-18] 02/25/2014
Rep. Rokita, Todd [R-IN-4] 02/25/2014
Rep. Southerland, Steve II [R-FL-2] 02/27/2014
Rep. DeSantis, Ron [R-FL-6] 02/27/2014
Rep. Ellison, Keith [D-MN-5] 02/27/2014
Rep. Fleischmann, Charles J. "Chuck" [R-TN-3] 02/27/2014
Rep. Cook, Paul [R-CA-8] 02/27/2014
Rep. Miller, Jeff [R-FL-1] 02/27/2014
Rep. Gardner, Cory [R-CO-4] 02/27/2014
Rep. Fudge, Marcia L. [D-OH-11] 02/27/2014
Rep. Bachus, Spencer [R-AL-6] 02/27/2014
Rep. Webster, Daniel [R-FL-10] 02/28/2014
Rep. Sinema, Kyrsten [D-AZ-9] 02/28/2014
Rep. Gibbs, Bob [R-OH-7] 03/04/2014
Rep. Guthrie, Brett [R-KY-2] 03/04/2014
Rep. Coble, Howard [R-NC-6] 03/04/2014
Rep. Mica, John L. [R-FL-7] 03/04/2014
Rep. Black, Diane [R-TN-6] 03/04/2014
Rep. Rice, Tom [R-SC-7] 03/04/2014
Rep. Tipton, Scott R. [R-CO-3] 03/04/2014
Rep. King, Peter T. [R-NY-2] 03/06/2014
Rep. Perlmutter, Ed [D-CO-7] 03/12/2014
Rep. Napolitano, Grace F. [D-CA-32] 03/12/2014
Rep. Fitzpatrick, Michael G. [R-PA-8] 03/12/2014
Rep. Olson, Pete [R-TX-22] 03/12/2014
Rep. Barton, Joe [R-TX-6] 03/13/2014
Rep. Thompson, Glenn [R-PA-5] 03/13/2014
Rep. Takano, Mark [D-CA-41] 03/13/2014
Rep. Cotton, Tom [R-AR-4] 03/13/2014
Rep. Thompson, Bennie G. [D-MS-2] 03/18/2014
Rep. Smith, Adrian [R-NE-3] 03/18/2014
Rep. Granger, Kay [R-TX-12] 03/18/2014
Rep. Farenthold, Blake [R-TX-27] 03/24/2014
Rep. Collins, Doug [R-GA-9] 03/24/2014
Rep. Norton, Eleanor Holmes [D-DC-At Large] 03/24/2014
Rep. Rush, Bobby L. [D-IL-1] 03/24/2014
Rep. Westmoreland, Lynn A. [R-GA-3] 03/24/2014
Rep. Blumenauer, Earl [D-OR-3] 03/24/2014
Rep. Joyce, David P. [R-OH-14] 03/24/2014
Rep. Kingston, Jack [R-GA-1] 03/24/2014
Rep. Renacci, James B. [R-OH-16] 03/24/2014
Rep. Pocan, Mark [D-WI-2] 03/26/2014
Rep. Upton, Fred [R-MI-6] 03/26/2014
Rep. Smith, Lamar [R-TX-21] 03/26/2014
Rep. Pastor, Ed [D-AZ-7] 03/26/2014
Rep. Scott, David [D-GA-13] 03/27/2014
Rep. Veasey, Marc A. [D-TX-33] 03/27/2014
Rep. Jenkins, Lynn [R-KS-2] 03/27/2014
Rep. Jordan, Jim [R-OH-4] 03/27/2014
Rep. Broun, Paul C. [R-GA-10] 03/27/2014
Rep. Amodei, Mark E. [R-NV-2] 03/27/2014
Rep. Hinojosa, Ruben [D-TX-15] 03/28/2014
Rep. Jackson Lee, Sheila [D-TX-18] 03/28/2014
Rep. Barrow, John [D-GA-12] 03/28/2014
Rep. Bilirakis, Gus M. [R-FL-12] 04/07/2014
Rep. Carson, Andre [D-IN-7] 04/07/2014
Rep. Kirkpatrick, Ann [D-AZ-1] 04/07/2014
Rep. Gingrey, Phil [R-GA-11] 04/07/2014
Rep. Johnson, Sam [R-TX-3] 04/07/2014
Rep. Culberson, John Abney [R-TX-7] 04/07/2014
Rep. Marchant, Kenny [R-TX-24] 04/07/2014
Rep. Smith, Christopher H. [R-NJ-4] 04/07/2014
Rep. Mulvaney, Mick [R-SC-5] 04/07/2014
Rep. Braley, Bruce L. [D-IA-1] 04/07/2014
Rep. Murphy, Tim [R-PA-18] 04/07/2014
Rep. Poe, Ted [R-TX-2] 04/08/2014
Rep. Hall, Ralph M. [R-TX-4] 04/08/2014
Rep. Israel, Steve [D-NY-3] 04/10/2014
Rep. Camp, Dave [R-MI-4] 04/10/2014