Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor

CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Perry, Scott [R-PA-4]* 01/27/2014
Rep. Rothfus, Keith J. [R-PA-12]* 01/27/2014
Rep. Dent, Charles W. [R-PA-15] 01/28/2014
Rep. Gerlach, Jim [R-PA-6] 02/05/2014
Rep. Schwartz, Allyson Y. [D-PA-13] 02/25/2014
Rep. Fitzpatrick, Michael G. [R-PA-8] 03/12/2014
Rep. Thompson, Glenn [R-PA-5] 03/13/2014
Rep. Murphy, Tim [R-PA-18] 04/07/2014