Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor

CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Stivers, Steve [R-OH-15] 01/28/2014
Rep. Tiberi, Patrick J. [R-OH-12] 02/03/2014
Rep. Latta, Robert E. [R-OH-5] 02/04/2014
Rep. Chabot, Steve [R-OH-1] 02/05/2014
Rep. Johnson, Bill [R-OH-6] 02/10/2014
Rep. Ryan, Tim [D-OH-13] 02/11/2014
Rep. Beatty, Joyce [D-OH-3] 02/21/2014
Rep. Fudge, Marcia L. [D-OH-11] 02/27/2014
Rep. Gibbs, Bob [R-OH-7] 03/04/2014
Rep. Joyce, David P. [R-OH-14] 03/24/2014
Rep. Renacci, James B. [R-OH-16] 03/24/2014
Rep. Jordan, Jim [R-OH-4] 03/27/2014