Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor

CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Miller, Candice S. [R-MI-10] 01/15/2014
Rep. Brady, Kevin [R-TX-8] 01/16/2014
Rep. Kelly, Mike [R-PA-3] 01/16/2014
Rep. Boustany, Charles W., Jr. [R-LA-3] 01/16/2014
Rep. Graves, Sam [R-MO-6] 01/16/2014
Rep. Griffin, Tim [R-AR-2] 01/16/2014
Rep. Jenkins, Lynn [R-KS-2] 01/16/2014
Rep. Johnson, Sam [R-TX-3] 01/16/2014
Rep. Reed, Tom [R-NY-23] 01/16/2014
Rep. Blackburn, Marsha [R-TN-7] 01/16/2014
Rep. Black, Diane [R-TN-6] 01/16/2014
Rep. Paulsen, Erik [R-MN-3] 01/16/2014
Rep. Tiberi, Patrick J. [R-OH-12] 01/16/2014
Rep. Harper, Gregg [R-MS-3] 01/16/2014
Rep. Young, Todd C. [R-IN-9] 01/16/2014
Rep. Renacci, James B. [R-OH-16] 01/16/2014
Rep. Roskam, Peter J. [R-IL-6] 01/16/2014
Rep. Smith, Adrian [R-NE-3] 01/16/2014
Rep. Nunes, Devin [R-CA-22] 01/16/2014
Rep. Ryan, Paul [R-WI-1] 01/16/2014
Rep. Reichert, David G. [R-WA-8] 01/16/2014
Rep. Schock, Aaron [R-IL-18] 01/16/2014
Rep. DesJarlais, Scott [R-TN-4] 01/17/2014
Rep. Weber, Randy K. Sr. [R-TX-14] 01/17/2014
Rep. Goodlatte, Bob [R-VA-6] 01/28/2014
Rep. Carter, John R. [R-TX-31] 01/28/2014
Rep. Olson, Pete [R-TX-22] 01/28/2014
Rep. Price, Tom [R-GA-6] 01/28/2014
Rep. Scalise, Steve [R-LA-1] 01/28/2014
Rep. Nunnelee, Alan [R-MS-1] 01/28/2014
Rep. Stivers, Steve [R-OH-15] 01/28/2014
Rep. Huelskamp, Tim [R-KS-1] 02/03/2014
Rep. Barton, Joe [R-TX-6] 02/03/2014
Rep. Forbes, J. Randy [R-VA-4] 02/03/2014
Rep. Mulvaney, Mick [R-SC-5] 02/03/2014
Rep. Hartzler, Vicky [R-MO-4] 02/03/2014
Rep. Hurt, Robert [R-VA-5] 02/03/2014
Rep. Walberg, Tim [R-MI-7] 02/04/2014
Rep. Collins, Chris [R-NY-27] 02/04/2014
Rep. Rokita, Todd [R-IN-4] 02/04/2014
Rep. Culberson, John Abney [R-TX-7] 02/05/2014
Rep. Bachmann, Michele [R-MN-6] 02/05/2014
Rep. Lummis, Cynthia M. [R-WY-At Large] 02/05/2014
Rep. Smith, Jason T. [R-MO-8] 02/05/2014
Rep. Huizenga, Bill [R-MI-2] 02/10/2014
Rep. Gerlach, Jim [R-PA-6] 02/10/2014
Rep. Nugent, Richard B. [R-FL-11] 02/10/2014
Rep. Marchant, Kenny [R-TX-24] 02/10/2014
Rep. Hall, Ralph M. [R-TX-4] 02/10/2014
Rep. McClintock, Tom [R-CA-4] 02/10/2014
Rep. Gohmert, Louie [R-TX-1] 02/10/2014
Rep. Buchanan, Vern [R-FL-16] 02/10/2014
Rep. Franks, Trent [R-AZ-8] 02/10/2014
Rep. Benishek, Dan [R-MI-1] 02/10/2014
Rep. Noem, Kristi L. [R-SD-At Large] 02/10/2014
Rep. Wilson, Joe [R-SC-2] 02/10/2014
Rep. Sessions, Pete [R-TX-32] 02/10/2014
Rep. Cramer, Kevin [R-ND-At Large] 02/10/2014
Rep. Gingrey, Phil [R-GA-11] 02/10/2014
Rep. Foxx, Virginia [R-NC-5] 02/10/2014
Rep. Kline, John [R-MN-2] 02/10/2014
Rep. Perry, Scott [R-PA-4] 02/11/2014
Rep. Poe, Ted [R-TX-2] 02/11/2014
Rep. Smith, Lamar [R-TX-21] 02/14/2014
Rep. Griffith, H. Morgan [R-VA-9] 02/14/2014
Rep. Yoder, Kevin [R-KS-3] 02/14/2014