Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor

CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Welch, Peter [D-VT-At Large]* 01/13/2014
Rep. Sensenbrenner, F. James, Jr. [R-WI-5]* 01/13/2014
Rep. Price, David E. [D-NC-4]* 01/13/2014
Rep. Gutierrez, Luis V. [D-IL-4]* 01/13/2014
Rep. Jordan, Jim [R-OH-4]* 01/13/2014
Rep. Amash, Justin [R-MI-3] 01/14/2014
Rep. Massie, Thomas [R-KY-4] 01/14/2014
Rep. Mulvaney, Mick [R-SC-5] 01/14/2014
Rep. Huelskamp, Tim [R-KS-1] 01/14/2014
Rep. Harris, Andy [R-MD-1] 01/14/2014
Rep. Yoho, Ted S. [R-FL-3] 01/14/2014
Rep. Rokita, Todd [R-IN-4] 01/14/2014
Rep. Gohmert, Louie [R-TX-1] 01/14/2014
Rep. Capuano, Michael E. [D-MA-7] 01/14/2014
Rep. Brownley, Julia [D-CA-26] 01/14/2014
Rep. Carney, John C., Jr. [D-DE-At Large] 01/14/2014
Rep. Clay, Wm. Lacy [D-MO-1] 01/14/2014
Rep. Van Hollen, Chris [D-MD-8] 01/14/2014
Rep. DesJarlais, Scott [R-TN-4] 01/15/2014
Rep. Smith, Adam [D-WA-9] 01/15/2014
Rep. Conyers, John, Jr. [D-MI-13] 01/16/2014
Rep. Lee, Barbara [D-CA-13] 01/16/2014
Rep. Burgess, Michael C. [R-TX-26] 01/16/2014
Rep. Poe, Ted [R-TX-2] 01/16/2014
Rep. Blumenauer, Earl [D-OR-3] 01/16/2014
Rep. McGovern, James P. [D-MA-2] 01/16/2014
Rep. Tonko, Paul [D-NY-20] 01/17/2014
Rep. Ellison, Keith [D-MN-5] 01/17/2014
Rep. DeFazio, Peter A. [D-OR-4] 01/17/2014
Rep. Nolan, Richard M. [D-MN-8] 01/17/2014
Rep. Eshoo, Anna G. [D-CA-18] 01/17/2014
Rep. Larsen, Rick [D-WA-2] 01/17/2014
Rep. Hanabusa, Colleen W. [D-HI-1] 01/17/2014
Rep. O'Rourke, Beto [D-TX-16] 01/17/2014
Rep. Holt, Rush [D-NJ-12] 01/28/2014
Rep. Norton, Eleanor Holmes [D-DC-At Large] 01/28/2014
Rep. Grayson, Alan [D-FL-9] 01/28/2014
Rep. Jones, Walter B., Jr. [R-NC-3] 01/28/2014
Rep. Honda, Michael M. [D-CA-17] 01/28/2014
Rep. Ribble, Reid J. [R-WI-8] 01/28/2014
Rep. Lofgren, Zoe [D-CA-19] 01/28/2014
Rep. Castor, Kathy [D-FL-14] 01/28/2014
Rep. Cohen, Steve [D-TN-9] 02/03/2014
Rep. Rush, Bobby L. [D-IL-1] 02/03/2014
Rep. Cicilline, David N. [D-RI-1] 02/03/2014
Rep. Yarmuth, John A. [D-KY-3] 02/03/2014
Rep. Huffman, Jared [D-CA-2] 02/03/2014
Rep. DelBene, Suzan K. [D-WA-1] 02/03/2014
Rep. Terry, Lee [R-NE-2] 02/06/2014
Rep. Yoder, Kevin [R-KS-3] 02/10/2014
Rep. Gowdy, Trey [R-SC-4] 02/10/2014
Rep. Labrador, Raul R. [R-ID-1] 02/10/2014
Rep. Young, Don [R-AK-At Large] 02/10/2014
Rep. Pascrell, Bill, Jr. [D-NJ-9] 02/10/2014
Rep. Farr, Sam [D-CA-20] 02/10/2014
Rep. Garamendi, John [D-CA-3] 02/10/2014
Rep. Cramer, Kevin [R-ND-At Large] 02/11/2014
Rep. Daines, Steve [R-MT-At Large] 02/11/2014
Rep. Lynch, Stephen F. [D-MA-8] 02/25/2014
Rep. Schakowsky, Janice D. [D-IL-9] 03/18/2014