Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor

CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Harris, Andy [R-MD-1]* 01/09/2014
Rep. Rice, Tom [R-SC-7]* 01/09/2014
Rep. LaMalfa, Doug [R-CA-1]* 01/09/2014
Rep. Gohmert, Louie [R-TX-1]* 01/09/2014
Rep. Hall, Ralph M. [R-TX-4]* 01/09/2014
Rep. Carter, John R. [R-TX-31]* 01/09/2014
Rep. Yoho, Ted S. [R-FL-3]* 01/09/2014
Rep. Flores, Bill [R-TX-17]* 01/09/2014
Rep. Wolf, Frank R. [R-VA-10]* 01/09/2014
Rep. Latta, Robert E. [R-OH-5]* 01/09/2014
Rep. Bishop, Rob [R-UT-1]* 01/09/2014
Rep. Pittenger, Robert [R-NC-9]* 01/09/2014
Rep. Conaway, K. Michael [R-TX-11]* 01/09/2014
Rep. Bachmann, Michele [R-MN-6]* 01/09/2014
Rep. Fleming, John [R-LA-4]* 01/09/2014
Rep. Lankford, James [R-OK-5]* 01/09/2014
Rep. Bridenstine, Jim [R-OK-1]* 01/09/2014
Rep. Jordan, Jim [R-OH-4]* 01/09/2014
Rep. Pitts, Joseph R. [R-PA-16]* 01/09/2014
Rep. Pompeo, Mike [R-KS-4]* 01/09/2014
Rep. Neugebauer, Randy [R-TX-19]* 01/09/2014
Rep. Culberson, John Abney [R-TX-7]* 01/09/2014
Rep. Granger, Kay [R-TX-12]* 01/09/2014
Rep. Johnson, Sam [R-TX-3]* 01/09/2014
Rep. Marchant, Kenny [R-TX-24]* 01/09/2014
Rep. Olson, Pete [R-TX-22]* 01/09/2014
Rep. Webster, Daniel [R-FL-10]* 01/09/2014
Rep. McIntyre, Mike [D-NC-7] 01/15/2014
Rep. McClintock, Tom [R-CA-4] 01/15/2014
Rep. Williams, Roger [R-TX-25] 01/15/2014
Rep. Daines, Steve [R-MT-At Large] 01/15/2014
Rep. DesJarlais, Scott [R-TN-4] 01/15/2014
Rep. Massie, Thomas [R-KY-4] 01/15/2014
Rep. Palazzo, Steven M. [R-MS-4] 01/15/2014
Rep. Lamborn, Doug [R-CO-5] 01/16/2014
Rep. Scott, Austin [R-GA-8] 01/16/2014
Rep. Pearce, Stevan [R-NM-2] 01/16/2014
Rep. Lummis, Cynthia M. [R-WY-At Large] 01/16/2014
Rep. Jones, Walter B., Jr. [R-NC-3] 02/04/2014
Rep. Stewart, Chris [R-UT-2] 02/04/2014
Rep. Calvert, Ken [R-CA-42] 02/04/2014
Rep. Whitfield, Ed [R-KY-1] 02/04/2014
Rep. Collins, Doug [R-GA-9] 02/04/2014
Rep. Mullin, Markwayne [R-OK-2] 02/04/2014
Rep. Fincher, Stephen Lee [R-TN-8] 02/04/2014
Rep. Scalise, Steve [R-LA-1] 02/04/2014
Rep. Nunnelee, Alan [R-MS-1] 02/04/2014
Rep. Fleischmann, Charles J. "Chuck" [R-TN-3] 02/04/2014
Rep. Forbes, J. Randy [R-VA-4] 02/04/2014
Rep. Huelskamp, Tim [R-KS-1] 02/04/2014
Rep. Broun, Paul C. [R-GA-10] 02/04/2014
Rep. Cramer, Kevin [R-ND-At Large] 02/04/2014
Rep. Miller, Jeff [R-FL-1] 02/04/2014
Rep. McCaul, Michael T. [R-TX-10] 02/11/2014
Rep. Crawford, Eric A. "Rick" [R-AR-1] 02/11/2014
Rep. Kelly, Mike [R-PA-3] 02/11/2014
Rep. Johnson, Bill [R-OH-6] 02/11/2014
Rep. Duncan, Jeff [R-SC-3] 02/26/2014
Rep. Kingston, Jack [R-GA-1] 02/26/2014
Rep. Gosar, Paul A. [R-AZ-4] 02/26/2014
Rep. Gingrey, Phil [R-GA-11] 03/06/2014
Rep. Franks, Trent [R-AZ-8] 03/06/2014
Rep. Sessions, Pete [R-TX-32] 03/06/2014
Rep. Smith, Lamar [R-TX-21] 04/01/2014
Rep. Shuster, Bill [R-PA-9] 04/01/2014
Rep. Rothfus, Keith J. [R-PA-12] 04/01/2014
Rep. Walberg, Tim [R-MI-7] 04/01/2014