Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor

CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Jones, Walter B., Jr. [R-NC-3] 01/07/2014
Rep. Cardenas, Tony [D-CA-29] 01/07/2014
Rep. Lee, Barbara [D-CA-13] 01/07/2014
Rep. Vargas, Juan [D-CA-51] 01/08/2014
Rep. Kilmer, Derek [D-WA-6] 01/08/2014
Rep. Shea-Porter, Carol [D-NH-1] 01/13/2014
Rep. Brown, Corrine [D-FL-5] 01/27/2014
Rep. McNerney, Jerry [D-CA-9] 02/25/2014