Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor

CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Barber, Ron [D-AZ-2]* 12/19/2013
Rep. Barletta, Lou [R-PA-11]* 12/19/2013
Rep. Benishek, Dan [R-MI-1]* 12/19/2013
Rep. Bilirakis, Gus M. [R-FL-12]* 12/19/2013
Rep. Bishop, Rob [R-UT-1]* 12/19/2013
Rep. Bordallo, Madeleine Z. [D-GU-At Large]* 12/19/2013
Rep. Boustany, Charles W., Jr. [R-LA-3]* 12/19/2013
Rep. Bridenstine, Jim [R-OK-1]* 12/19/2013
Rep. Buchanan, Vern [R-FL-16]* 12/19/2013
Rep. Bucshon, Larry [R-IN-8]* 12/19/2013
Rep. Bustos, Cheri [D-IL-17]* 12/19/2013
Rep. Capps, Lois [D-CA-24]* 12/19/2013
Rep. Coffman, Mike [R-CO-6]* 12/19/2013
Rep. Cole, Tom [R-OK-4]* 12/19/2013
Rep. Conaway, K. Michael [R-TX-11]* 12/19/2013
Rep. Cook, Paul [R-CA-8]* 12/19/2013
Rep. Courtney, Joe [D-CT-2]* 12/19/2013
Rep. Cramer, Kevin [R-ND-At Large]* 12/19/2013
Rep. Crenshaw, Ander [R-FL-4]* 12/19/2013
Rep. Culberson, John Abney [R-TX-7]* 12/19/2013
Rep. Davis, Rodney [R-IL-13]* 12/19/2013
Rep. Dent, Charles W. [R-PA-15]* 12/19/2013
Rep. DeSantis, Ron [R-FL-6]* 12/19/2013
Rep. Diaz-Balart, Mario [R-FL-25]* 12/19/2013
Rep. Duckworth, Tammy [D-IL-8]* 12/19/2013
Rep. Duncan, Jeff [R-SC-3]* 12/19/2013
Rep. Enyart, William L. [D-IL-12]* 12/19/2013
Rep. Farenthold, Blake [R-TX-27]* 12/19/2013
Rep. Fincher, Stephen Lee [R-TN-8]* 12/19/2013
Rep. Fitzpatrick, Michael G. [R-PA-8]* 12/19/2013
Rep. Forbes, J. Randy [R-VA-4]* 12/19/2013
Rep. Fortenberry, Jeff [R-NE-1]* 12/19/2013
Rep. Foxx, Virginia [R-NC-5]* 12/19/2013
Rep. Frankel, Lois [D-FL-22]* 12/19/2013
Rep. Franks, Trent [R-AZ-8]* 12/19/2013
Rep. Gallego, Pete P. [D-TX-23]* 12/19/2013
Rep. Garcia, Joe [D-FL-26]* 12/19/2013
Rep. Gibbs, Bob [R-OH-7]* 12/19/2013
Rep. Gibson, Christopher P. [R-NY-19]* 12/19/2013
Rep. Grayson, Alan [D-FL-9]* 12/19/2013
Rep. Green, Al [D-TX-9]* 12/19/2013
Rep. Griffin, Tim [R-AR-2]* 12/19/2013
Rep. Grimm, Michael G. [R-NY-11]* 12/19/2013
Rep. Hanabusa, Colleen W. [D-HI-1]* 12/19/2013
Rep. Higgins, Brian [D-NY-26]* 12/19/2013
Rep. Hinojosa, Ruben [D-TX-15]* 12/19/2013
Rep. Honda, Michael M. [D-CA-17]* 12/19/2013
Rep. Huizenga, Bill [R-MI-2]* 12/19/2013
Rep. Hultgren, Randy [R-IL-14]* 12/19/2013
Rep. Hunter, Duncan D. [R-CA-50]* 12/19/2013
Rep. Jenkins, Lynn [R-KS-2]* 12/19/2013
Rep. Johnson, Bill [R-OH-6]* 12/19/2013
Rep. Jones, Walter B., Jr. [R-NC-3]* 12/19/2013
Rep. Kelly, Mike [R-PA-3]* 12/19/2013
Rep. Kinzinger, Adam [R-IL-16]* 12/19/2013
Rep. Kirkpatrick, Ann [D-AZ-1]* 12/19/2013
Rep. Kuster, Ann M. [D-NH-2]* 12/19/2013
Rep. Lamborn, Doug [R-CO-5]* 12/19/2013
Rep. Lance, Leonard [R-NJ-7]* 12/19/2013
Rep. Lankford, James [R-OK-5]* 12/19/2013
Rep. Larson, John B. [D-CT-1]* 12/19/2013
Rep. LoBiondo, Frank A. [R-NJ-2]* 12/19/2013
Rep. Loebsack, David [D-IA-2]* 12/19/2013
Rep. Maloney, Sean Patrick [D-NY-18]* 12/19/2013
Rep. Marino, Tom [R-PA-10]* 12/19/2013
Rep. Massie, Thomas [R-KY-4]* 12/19/2013
Rep. McCarthy, Kevin [R-CA-23]* 12/19/2013
Rep. McCaul, Michael T. [R-TX-10]* 12/19/2013
Rep. McKinley, David B. [R-WV-1]* 12/19/2013
Rep. McMorris Rodgers, Cathy [R-WA-5]* 12/19/2013
Rep. Meehan, Patrick [R-PA-7]* 12/19/2013
Rep. Murphy, Patrick [D-FL-18]* 12/19/2013
Rep. Murphy, Tim [R-PA-18]* 12/19/2013
Rep. Neugebauer, Randy [R-TX-19]* 12/19/2013
Rep. Noem, Kristi L. [R-SD-At Large]* 12/19/2013
Rep. O'Rourke, Beto [D-TX-16]* 12/19/2013
Rep. Owens, William L. [D-NY-21]* 12/19/2013
Rep. Palazzo, Steven M. [R-MS-4]* 12/19/2013
Rep. Pearce, Stevan [R-NM-2]* 12/19/2013
Rep. Pingree, Chellie [D-ME-1]* 12/19/2013
Rep. Posey, Bill [R-FL-8]* 12/19/2013
Rep. Rahall, Nick J., II [D-WV-3]* 12/19/2013
Rep. Rice, Tom [R-SC-7]* 12/19/2013
Rep. Rigell, E. Scott [R-VA-2]* 12/19/2013
Rep. Roe, David P. [R-TN-1]* 12/19/2013
Rep. Rooney, Thomas J. [R-FL-17]* 12/19/2013
Rep. Ros-Lehtinen, Ileana [R-FL-27]* 12/19/2013
Rep. Ross, Dennis A. [R-FL-15]* 12/19/2013
Rep. Rothfus, Keith J. [R-PA-12]* 12/19/2013
Rep. Runyan, Jon [R-NJ-3]* 12/19/2013
Rep. Ruppersberger, C. A. Dutch [D-MD-2]* 12/19/2013
Rep. Scott, Austin [R-GA-8]* 12/19/2013
Rep. Sessions, Pete [R-TX-32]* 12/19/2013
Rep. Sewell, Terri A. [D-AL-7]* 12/19/2013
Rep. Shea-Porter, Carol [D-NH-1]* 12/19/2013
Rep. Simpson, Michael K. [R-ID-2]* 12/19/2013
Rep. Sinema, Kyrsten [D-AZ-9]* 12/19/2013
Rep. Smith, Lamar [R-TX-21]* 12/19/2013
Rep. Southerland, Steve II [R-FL-2]* 12/19/2013
Rep. Stivers, Steve [R-OH-15]* 12/19/2013
Rep. Takano, Mark [D-CA-41]* 12/19/2013
Rep. Terry, Lee [R-NE-2]* 12/19/2013
Rep. Thompson, Glenn [R-PA-5]* 12/19/2013
Rep. Titus, Dina [D-NV-1]* 12/19/2013
Rep. Turner, Michael R. [R-OH-10]* 12/19/2013
Rep. Valadao, David G. [R-CA-21]* 12/19/2013
Rep. Vela, Filemon [D-TX-34]* 12/19/2013
Rep. Walberg, Tim [R-MI-7]* 12/19/2013
Rep. Walorski, Jackie [R-IN-2]* 12/19/2013
Rep. Walz, Timothy J. [D-MN-1]* 12/19/2013
Rep. Westmoreland, Lynn A. [R-GA-3]* 12/19/2013
Rep. Williams, Roger [R-TX-25]* 12/19/2013
Rep. Wilson, Joe [R-SC-2]* 12/19/2013
Rep. Wittman, Robert J. [R-VA-1]* 12/19/2013
Rep. Yoder, Kevin [R-KS-3]* 12/19/2013
Rep. Yoho, Ted S. [R-FL-3]* 12/19/2013
Rep. Mica, John L. [R-FL-7]* 12/19/2013
Rep. Carter, John R. [R-TX-31]* 12/19/2013
Rep. Green, Gene [D-TX-29]* 12/19/2013
Rep. Perry, Scott [R-PA-4]* 12/19/2013
Rep. Graves, Tom [R-GA-14] 12/23/2013
Rep. Ellison, Keith [D-MN-5] 12/23/2013
Rep. Kind, Ron [D-WI-3] 12/23/2013
Rep. Amodei, Mark E. [R-NV-2] 12/23/2013
Rep. Renacci, James B. [R-OH-16] 12/23/2013
Rep. Johnson, Eddie Bernice [D-TX-30] 12/23/2013
Rep. Foster, Bill [D-IL-11] 12/23/2013
Rep. Negrete McLeod, Gloria [D-CA-35] 12/23/2013
Rep. Joyce, David P. [R-OH-14] 12/23/2013
Rep. Kline, John [R-MN-2] 12/23/2013
Rep. Duffy, Sean P. [R-WI-7] 01/03/2014
Rep. Latta, Robert E. [R-OH-5] 01/07/2014
Rep. Marchant, Kenny [R-TX-24] 01/07/2014
Rep. Sablan, Gregorio Kilili Camacho [D-MP-At Large] 01/07/2014
Rep. Broun, Paul C. [R-GA-10] 01/07/2014
Rep. Michaud, Michael H. [D-ME-2] 01/07/2014
Rep. Capito, Shelley Moore [R-WV-2] 01/07/2014
Rep. Cassidy, Bill [R-LA-6] 01/07/2014
Rep. Reed, Tom [R-NY-23] 01/07/2014
Rep. Roskam, Peter J. [R-IL-6] 01/08/2014
Rep. Pittenger, Robert [R-NC-9] 01/08/2014
Rep. Ellmers, Renee L. [R-NC-2] 01/08/2014
Rep. Long, Billy [R-MO-7] 01/08/2014
Rep. Thompson, Mike [D-CA-5] 01/08/2014
Rep. Gardner, Cory [R-CO-4] 01/08/2014
Rep. Swalwell, Eric [D-CA-15] 01/08/2014
Rep. Bera, Ami [D-CA-7] 01/08/2014
Rep. Young, Don [R-AK-At Large] 01/10/2014
Rep. Harper, Gregg [R-MS-3] 01/10/2014
Rep. Gabbard, Tulsi [D-HI-2] 02/03/2014