Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor

CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Meehan, Patrick [R-PA-7]* 12/12/2013
Rep. Roe, David P. [R-TN-1] 12/19/2013
Rep. Westmoreland, Lynn A. [R-GA-3] 01/03/2014
Rep. Cook, Paul [R-CA-8] 01/03/2014
Rep. LaMalfa, Doug [R-CA-1] 01/03/2014
Rep. Joyce, David P. [R-OH-14] 01/03/2014
Rep. Cassidy, Bill [R-LA-6] 01/07/2014
Rep. Davis, Rodney [R-IL-13] 01/07/2014
Rep. Renacci, James B. [R-OH-16] 01/07/2014
Rep. Long, Billy [R-MO-7] 01/09/2014