Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor

CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Cassidy, Bill [R-LA-6]* 12/12/2013
Rep. Lance, Leonard [R-NJ-7]* 12/12/2013
Rep. Johnson, Eddie Bernice [D-TX-30]* 12/12/2013
Rep. Fortenberry, Jeff [R-NE-1] 12/16/2013
Rep. Stivers, Steve [R-OH-15] 12/16/2013
Rep. Ellmers, Renee L. [R-NC-2] 12/16/2013
Rep. Terry, Lee [R-NE-2] 12/16/2013
Rep. Roe, David P. [R-TN-1] 12/19/2013
Rep. Thompson, Glenn [R-PA-5] 01/03/2014
Rep. Loebsack, David [D-IA-2] 01/03/2014
Rep. Fitzpatrick, Michael G. [R-PA-8] 01/03/2014
Rep. Cole, Tom [R-OK-4] 01/08/2014
Rep. Meehan, Patrick [R-PA-7] 01/08/2014
Rep. Crawford, Eric A. "Rick" [R-AR-1] 01/08/2014
Rep. Miller, Candice S. [R-MI-10] 01/08/2014
Rep. Shuster, Bill [R-PA-9] 01/08/2014
Rep. Kelly, Mike [R-PA-3] 01/09/2014
Rep. Coffman, Mike [R-CO-6] 01/09/2014
Rep. Turner, Michael R. [R-OH-10] 01/09/2014
Rep. Vargas, Juan [D-CA-51] 01/09/2014
Rep. Roskam, Peter J. [R-IL-6] 01/09/2014
Rep. Salmon, Matt [R-AZ-5] 01/13/2014
Rep. Benishek, Dan [R-MI-1] 01/13/2014
Rep. Gerlach, Jim [R-PA-6] 01/14/2014
Rep. Olson, Pete [R-TX-22] 01/15/2014
Rep. Capito, Shelley Moore [R-WV-2] 01/15/2014
Rep. Calvert, Ken [R-CA-42] 01/16/2014
Rep. Brooks, Susan W. [R-IN-5] 01/16/2014
Rep. Hartzler, Vicky [R-MO-4] 01/27/2014
Rep. King, Peter T. [R-NY-2] 01/29/2014
Rep. Dent, Charles W. [R-PA-15] 01/29/2014
Rep. Michaud, Michael H. [D-ME-2] 01/31/2014
Rep. Griffin, Tim [R-AR-2] 02/03/2014
Rep. Long, Billy [R-MO-7] 02/03/2014
Rep. Jackson Lee, Sheila [D-TX-18] 02/05/2014
Rep. Paulsen, Erik [R-MN-3] 02/10/2014
Rep. Whitfield, Ed [R-KY-1] 02/10/2014
Rep. Bera, Ami [D-CA-7] 02/10/2014
Rep. Walorski, Jackie [R-IN-2] 02/11/2014
Rep. Mullin, Markwayne [R-OK-2] 02/11/2014
Rep. Johnson, Bill [R-OH-6] 03/06/2014
Rep. Schweikert, David [R-AZ-6] 03/06/2014
Rep. Rothfus, Keith J. [R-PA-12] 03/11/2014
Rep. Brown, Corrine [D-FL-5] 03/14/2014
Rep. Hastings, Alcee L. [D-FL-20] 03/14/2014
Rep. Wilson, Joe [R-SC-2] 03/14/2014
Rep. Nunes, Devin [R-CA-22] 03/24/2014
Rep. McKinley, David B. [R-WV-1] 03/26/2014
Rep. Clay, Wm. Lacy [D-MO-1] 03/27/2014
Rep. Moore, Gwen [D-WI-4] 03/27/2014
Rep. Christensen, Donna M. [D-VI-At Large] 03/27/2014
Rep. Richmond, Cedric L. [D-LA-2] 03/27/2014
Rep. Jeffries, Hakeem S. [D-NY-8] 03/27/2014
Rep. Bishop, Sanford D., Jr. [D-GA-2] 03/27/2014
Rep. Veasey, Marc A. [D-TX-33] 03/27/2014
Rep. Grimm, Michael G. [R-NY-11] 03/27/2014
Rep. Rush, Bobby L. [D-IL-1] 03/27/2014
Rep. Norton, Eleanor Holmes [D-DC-At Large] 03/27/2014
Rep. Carson, Andre [D-IN-7] 03/27/2014
Rep. Sewell, Terri A. [D-AL-7] 03/28/2014
Rep. Rangel, Charles B. [D-NY-13] 04/01/2014
Rep. Thompson, Bennie G. [D-MS-2] 04/02/2014
Rep. Barr, Andy [R-KY-6] 04/04/2014
Rep. Wenstrup, Brad R. [R-OH-2] 04/04/2014
Rep. Gabbard, Tulsi [D-HI-2] 04/04/2014
Rep. Kinzinger, Adam [R-IL-16] 04/07/2014
Rep. Kaptur, Marcy [D-OH-9] 04/08/2014
Rep. Webster, Daniel [R-FL-10] 04/08/2014
Rep. Buchanan, Vern [R-FL-16] 04/08/2014
Rep. Diaz-Balart, Mario [R-FL-25] 04/09/2014
Rep. Sinema, Kyrsten [D-AZ-9] 04/09/2014
Rep. Carter, John R. [R-TX-31] 04/10/2014
Rep. Amodei, Mark E. [R-NV-2] 04/10/2014
Rep. Schock, Aaron [R-IL-18] 04/10/2014

Show cosponsors who withdrew