Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor

CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Clay, Wm. Lacy [D-MO-1]* 12/11/2013
Rep. Cleaver, Emanuel [D-MO-5]* 12/11/2013
Rep. Cohen, Steve [D-TN-9]* 12/11/2013
Rep. Cook, Paul [R-CA-8]* 12/11/2013
Rep. Faleomavaega, Eni F. H. [D-AS-At Large]* 12/11/2013
Rep. Green, Gene [D-TX-29]* 12/11/2013
Rep. Higgins, Brian [D-NY-26]* 12/11/2013
Rep. Issa, Darrell E. [R-CA-49]* 12/11/2013
Rep. Jackson Lee, Sheila [D-TX-18]* 12/11/2013
Rep. Lewis, John [D-GA-5]* 12/11/2013
Rep. McClintock, Tom [R-CA-4]* 12/11/2013
Rep. Poe, Ted [R-TX-2]* 12/11/2013
Rep. Ruiz, Raul [D-CA-36]* 12/11/2013
Rep. Sanchez, Loretta [D-CA-46]* 12/11/2013
Rep. Weber, Randy K. Sr. [R-TX-14]* 12/11/2013
Rep. Westmoreland, Lynn A. [R-GA-3]* 12/11/2013
Rep. Wilson, Joe [R-SC-2] 01/15/2014
Rep. Coffman, Mike [R-CO-6] 01/15/2014
Rep. Cotton, Tom [R-AR-4] 01/15/2014
Rep. Coble, Howard [R-NC-6] 01/15/2014
Rep. Christensen, Donna M. [D-VI-At Large] 01/21/2014
Rep. Negrete McLeod, Gloria [D-CA-35] 02/06/2014
Rep. Marino, Tom [R-PA-10] 02/06/2014
Rep. Wilson, Frederica S. [D-FL-24] 02/06/2014
Rep. Norton, Eleanor Holmes [D-DC-At Large] 02/06/2014
Rep. Peters, Gary C. [D-MI-14] 02/06/2014
Rep. Schock, Aaron [R-IL-18] 02/06/2014
Rep. Andrews, Robert E. [D-NJ-1] 02/06/2014
Rep. Smith, Christopher H. [R-NJ-4] 02/06/2014
Rep. Blackburn, Marsha [R-TN-7] 02/06/2014
Rep. Green, Al [D-TX-9] 02/10/2014
Rep. Bera, Ami [D-CA-7] 02/26/2014
Rep. Peterson, Collin C. [D-MN-7] 02/26/2014
Rep. Quigley, Mike [D-IL-5] 02/26/2014
Rep. Latham, Tom [R-IA-3] 02/26/2014
Rep. Hall, Ralph M. [R-TX-4] 02/26/2014
Rep. Johnson, Henry C. "Hank," Jr. [D-GA-4] 02/26/2014
Rep. McGovern, James P. [D-MA-2] 02/26/2014
Rep. Pierluisi, Pedro R. [D-PR-At Large] 02/26/2014
Rep. Harris, Andy [R-MD-1] 02/26/2014
Rep. Bishop, Sanford D., Jr. [D-GA-2] 02/26/2014
Rep. Davis, Danny K. [D-IL-7] 02/26/2014
Rep. Rush, Bobby L. [D-IL-1] 02/26/2014
Rep. Garamendi, John [D-CA-3] 02/26/2014
Rep. Vargas, Juan [D-CA-51] 02/26/2014
Rep. Young, Don [R-AK-At Large] 02/26/2014
Rep. Capuano, Michael E. [D-MA-7] 03/18/2014
Rep. Barletta, Lou [R-PA-11] 03/18/2014
Rep. Olson, Pete [R-TX-22] 03/18/2014
Rep. Griffin, Tim [R-AR-2] 04/03/2014
Rep. Holt, Rush [D-NJ-12] 04/10/2014
Rep. Payne, Donald M., Jr. [D-NJ-10] 04/10/2014