Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor

CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Crowley, Joseph [D-NY-14]* 12/11/2013
Rep. Reed, Tom [R-NY-23]* 12/11/2013
Rep. Roskam, Peter J. [R-IL-6]* 12/11/2013
Rep. Kind, Ron [D-WI-3]* 12/11/2013
Rep. Jenkins, Lynn [R-KS-2] 12/12/2013
Rep. Burgess, Michael C. [R-TX-26] 12/12/2013
Rep. Joyce, David P. [R-OH-14] 12/23/2013
Rep. Grimm, Michael G. [R-NY-11] 12/23/2013
Rep. Meehan, Patrick [R-PA-7] 12/23/2013
Rep. Tonko, Paul [D-NY-20] 12/23/2013
Rep. King, Peter T. [R-NY-2] 12/23/2013
Rep. Clarke, Yvette D. [D-NY-9] 12/23/2013
Rep. Nadler, Jerrold [D-NY-10] 12/23/2013
Rep. Rangel, Charles B. [D-NY-13] 12/23/2013
Rep. Schwartz, Allyson Y. [D-PA-13] 12/23/2013
Rep. Maloney, Carolyn B. [D-NY-12] 12/23/2013
Rep. Higgins, Brian [D-NY-26] 12/23/2013
Rep. Huelskamp, Tim [R-KS-1] 12/23/2013
Rep. Cramer, Kevin [R-ND-At Large] 12/23/2013
Rep. Harper, Gregg [R-MS-3] 12/23/2013
Rep. Roe, David P. [R-TN-1] 01/07/2014
Rep. Gibson, Christopher P. [R-NY-19] 01/07/2014
Rep. Meadows, Mark [R-NC-11] 01/07/2014
Rep. Serrano, Jose E. [D-NY-15] 01/08/2014
Rep. Brady, Robert A. [D-PA-1] 01/08/2014
Rep. Bishop, Sanford D., Jr. [D-GA-2] 01/08/2014
Rep. Owens, William L. [D-NY-21] 01/08/2014
Rep. Maloney, Sean Patrick [D-NY-18] 01/08/2014
Rep. Heck, Joseph J. [R-NV-3] 01/08/2014
Rep. Fattah, Chaka [D-PA-2] 01/08/2014
Rep. Meeks, Gregory W. [D-NY-5] 01/08/2014
Rep. Maffei, Daniel B. [D-NY-24] 01/08/2014
Rep. Barrow, John [D-GA-12] 01/08/2014
Rep. Lowey, Nita M. [D-NY-17] 01/08/2014
Rep. Meng, Grace [D-NY-6] 01/13/2014
Rep. Forbes, J. Randy [R-VA-4] 01/13/2014
Rep. McCarthy, Carolyn [D-NY-4] 01/13/2014
Rep. Tsongas, Niki [D-MA-3] 01/13/2014
Rep. Israel, Steve [D-NY-3] 01/13/2014
Rep. Engel, Eliot L. [D-NY-16] 01/13/2014
Rep. Hanna, Richard L. [R-NY-22] 01/13/2014
Rep. Tiberi, Patrick J. [R-OH-12] 01/13/2014
Rep. Franks, Trent [R-AZ-8] 01/13/2014
Rep. Dent, Charles W. [R-PA-15] 01/13/2014
Rep. Gardner, Cory [R-CO-4] 01/14/2014
Rep. Lynch, Stephen F. [D-MA-8] 01/21/2014
Rep. McGovern, James P. [D-MA-2] 01/21/2014
Rep. Barletta, Lou [R-PA-11] 01/21/2014
Rep. Pastor, Ed [D-AZ-7] 01/21/2014
Rep. Jeffries, Hakeem S. [D-NY-8] 01/21/2014
Rep. Latham, Tom [R-IA-3] 01/21/2014
Rep. Scott, Austin [R-GA-8] 01/21/2014
Rep. Scott, David [D-GA-13] 01/31/2014
Rep. Neal, Richard E. [D-MA-1] 01/31/2014
Rep. Hultgren, Randy [R-IL-14] 01/31/2014
Rep. Fudge, Marcia L. [D-OH-11] 01/31/2014
Rep. Larsen, Rick [D-WA-2] 01/31/2014
Rep. Marino, Tom [R-PA-10] 01/31/2014
Rep. Ruppersberger, C. A. Dutch [D-MD-2] 01/31/2014
Rep. Keating, William R. [D-MA-9] 01/31/2014
Rep. Bustos, Cheri [D-IL-17] 01/31/2014
Rep. Welch, Peter [D-VT-At Large] 01/31/2014
Rep. Fortenberry, Jeff [R-NE-1] 01/31/2014
Rep. Walorski, Jackie [R-IN-2] 01/31/2014
Rep. Matheson, Jim [D-UT-4] 01/31/2014
Rep. Michaud, Michael H. [D-ME-2] 01/31/2014
Rep. Johnson, Henry C. "Hank," Jr. [D-GA-4] 01/31/2014
Rep. Black, Diane [R-TN-6] 01/31/2014
Rep. Aderholt, Robert B. [R-AL-4] 01/31/2014
Rep. Young, Don [R-AK-At Large] 01/31/2014
Rep. Quigley, Mike [D-IL-5] 01/31/2014
Rep. Cummings, Elijah E. [D-MD-7] 01/31/2014
Rep. Wittman, Robert J. [R-VA-1] 01/31/2014
Rep. Bachmann, Michele [R-MN-6] 01/31/2014
Rep. Goodlatte, Bob [R-VA-6] 01/31/2014
Rep. Jones, Walter B., Jr. [R-NC-3] 01/31/2014
Rep. Renacci, James B. [R-OH-16] 01/31/2014
Rep. Capito, Shelley Moore [R-WV-2] 01/31/2014
Rep. Rahall, Nick J., II [D-WV-3] 01/31/2014
Rep. Cuellar, Henry [D-TX-28] 01/31/2014
Rep. Braley, Bruce L. [D-IA-1] 01/31/2014
Rep. Guthrie, Brett [R-KY-2] 01/31/2014
Rep. Bishop, Timothy H. [D-NY-1] 01/31/2014
Rep. Vargas, Juan [D-CA-51] 01/31/2014
Rep. Sires, Albio [D-NJ-8] 01/31/2014
Rep. Kelly, Robin L. [D-IL-2] 02/05/2014
Rep. Shuster, Bill [R-PA-9] 02/05/2014
Rep. Palazzo, Steven M. [R-MS-4] 02/05/2014
Rep. Loebsack, David [D-IA-2] 02/05/2014
Rep. Tierney, John F. [D-MA-6] 02/05/2014
Rep. Peterson, Collin C. [D-MN-7] 02/05/2014
Rep. Cook, Paul [R-CA-8] 02/10/2014
Rep. Miller, Candice S. [R-MI-10] 02/10/2014
Rep. Fitzpatrick, Michael G. [R-PA-8] 02/10/2014
Rep. Young, Todd C. [R-IN-9] 02/10/2014
Rep. Gutierrez, Luis V. [D-IL-4] 02/10/2014
Rep. Schneider, Bradley S. [D-IL-10] 02/21/2014
Rep. Davis, Rodney [R-IL-13] 02/21/2014
Rep. Latta, Robert E. [R-OH-5] 02/21/2014
Rep. Duncan, Jeff [R-SC-3] 02/21/2014
Rep. Foster, Bill [D-IL-11] 02/21/2014
Rep. Pocan, Mark [D-WI-2] 02/21/2014
Rep. Whitfield, Ed [R-KY-1] 02/21/2014
Rep. Rigell, E. Scott [R-VA-2] 02/21/2014
Rep. Boustany, Charles W., Jr. [R-LA-3] 02/25/2014
Rep. Clark, Katherine M. [D-MA-5] 02/25/2014
Rep. Kennedy, Joseph P. III [D-MA-4] 02/25/2014
Rep. Rush, Bobby L. [D-IL-1] 02/26/2014
Rep. Coffman, Mike [R-CO-6] 02/26/2014
Rep. DeFazio, Peter A. [D-OR-4] 02/27/2014
Rep. Salmon, Matt [R-AZ-5] 02/27/2014
Rep. McMorris Rodgers, Cathy [R-WA-5] 02/28/2014
Rep. Griffin, Tim [R-AR-2] 03/05/2014
Rep. Sessions, Pete [R-TX-32] 03/06/2014
Rep. Capuano, Michael E. [D-MA-7] 03/06/2014
Rep. Visclosky, Peter J. [D-IN-1] 03/11/2014
Rep. Ribble, Reid J. [R-WI-8] 03/11/2014
Rep. Slaughter, Louise McIntosh [D-NY-25] 03/12/2014
Rep. Kelly, Mike [R-PA-3] 03/12/2014
Rep. Conaway, K. Michael [R-TX-11] 03/13/2014
Rep. Esty, Elizabeth H. [D-CT-5] 03/21/2014
Rep. Thompson, Glenn [R-PA-5] 03/21/2014
Rep. Kuster, Ann M. [D-NH-2] 03/21/2014
Rep. Thompson, Bennie G. [D-MS-2] 03/24/2014
Rep. Cartwright, Matt [D-PA-17] 03/25/2014
Rep. Reichert, David G. [R-WA-8] 03/27/2014
Rep. Stivers, Steve [R-OH-15] 04/03/2014
Rep. Westmoreland, Lynn A. [R-GA-3] 04/03/2014
Rep. Beatty, Joyce [D-OH-3] 04/08/2014