Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor

CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Tsongas, Niki [D-MA-3] 01/13/2014
Rep. Lynch, Stephen F. [D-MA-8] 01/21/2014
Rep. McGovern, James P. [D-MA-2] 01/21/2014
Rep. Neal, Richard E. [D-MA-1] 01/31/2014
Rep. Keating, William R. [D-MA-9] 01/31/2014
Rep. Tierney, John F. [D-MA-6] 02/05/2014
Rep. Clark, Katherine M. [D-MA-5] 02/25/2014
Rep. Kennedy, Joseph P. III [D-MA-4] 02/25/2014
Rep. Capuano, Michael E. [D-MA-7] 03/06/2014