Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor

CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Meehan, Patrick [R-PA-7]* 12/10/2013
Rep. LoBiondo, Frank A. [R-NJ-2]* 12/10/2013
Rep. Runyan, Jon [R-NJ-3]* 12/10/2013
Rep. Fitzpatrick, Michael G. [R-PA-8]* 12/10/2013
Rep. Perry, Scott [R-PA-4]* 12/10/2013
Rep. Thompson, Glenn [R-PA-5]* 12/10/2013
Rep. Lance, Leonard [R-NJ-7]* 12/10/2013
Rep. Joyce, David P. [R-OH-14]* 12/10/2013
Rep. Simpson, Michael K. [R-ID-2]* 12/10/2013
Rep. Renacci, James B. [R-OH-16]* 12/10/2013
Rep. Meadows, Mark [R-NC-11]* 12/10/2013
Rep. Gerlach, Jim [R-PA-6]* 12/10/2013
Rep. Jones, Walter B., Jr. [R-NC-3]* 12/10/2013
Rep. Bachus, Spencer [R-AL-6]* 12/10/2013
Rep. Noem, Kristi L. [R-SD-At Large]* 12/10/2013
Rep. Miller, Candice S. [R-MI-10]* 12/10/2013
Rep. Huizenga, Bill [R-MI-2]* 12/10/2013
Rep. Grimm, Michael G. [R-NY-11]* 12/10/2013
Rep. Scott, Austin [R-GA-8]* 12/10/2013
Rep. Davis, Rodney [R-IL-13]* 12/10/2013
Rep. Hanna, Richard L. [R-NY-22]* 12/10/2013
Rep. McKinley, David B. [R-WV-1]* 12/10/2013
Rep. Walorski, Jackie [R-IN-2]* 12/10/2013
Rep. Fincher, Stephen Lee [R-TN-8]* 12/10/2013
Rep. Cotton, Tom [R-AR-4]* 12/10/2013
Rep. Shuster, Bill [R-PA-9]* 12/10/2013
Rep. Gardner, Cory [R-CO-4]* 12/10/2013
Rep. Pitts, Joseph R. [R-PA-16]* 12/10/2013
Rep. Collins, Chris [R-NY-27]* 12/10/2013
Rep. Marino, Tom [R-PA-10]* 12/10/2013
Rep. Barr, Andy [R-KY-6]* 12/10/2013
Rep. Shimkus, John [R-IL-15] 12/11/2013
Rep. Rothfus, Keith J. [R-PA-12] 12/11/2013
Rep. Young, Todd C. [R-IN-9] 12/11/2013
Rep. Jenkins, Lynn [R-KS-2] 12/11/2013
Rep. Murphy, Tim [R-PA-18] 12/11/2013
Rep. Stivers, Steve [R-OH-15] 12/11/2013
Rep. King, Peter T. [R-NY-2] 12/11/2013
Rep. Dent, Charles W. [R-PA-15] 12/11/2013
Rep. Reed, Tom [R-NY-23] 12/11/2013
Rep. Kelly, Mike [R-PA-3] 12/11/2013
Rep. Cramer, Kevin [R-ND-At Large] 12/12/2013
Rep. Crawford, Eric A. "Rick" [R-AR-1] 12/12/2013
Rep. Harris, Andy [R-MD-1] 12/12/2013
Rep. Courtney, Joe [D-CT-2] 12/12/2013
Rep. Maffei, Daniel B. [D-NY-24] 12/12/2013
Rep. Roe, David P. [R-TN-1] 12/12/2013
Rep. Amodei, Mark E. [R-NV-2] 12/12/2013
Rep. McHenry, Patrick T. [R-NC-10] 12/12/2013
Rep. Coble, Howard [R-NC-6] 12/12/2013
Rep. Graves, Sam [R-MO-6] 12/12/2013
Rep. Wittman, Robert J. [R-VA-1] 12/12/2013
Rep. Walden, Greg [R-OR-2] 12/12/2013
Rep. Esty, Elizabeth H. [D-CT-5] 12/12/2013
Rep. Wilson, Joe [R-SC-2] 12/12/2013
Rep. Sinema, Kyrsten [D-AZ-9] 12/12/2013
Rep. Hall, Ralph M. [R-TX-4] 12/12/2013
Rep. Frelinghuysen, Rodney P. [R-NJ-11] 12/12/2013
Rep. Lankford, James [R-OK-5] 12/16/2013
Rep. Goodlatte, Bob [R-VA-6] 12/16/2013
Rep. Westmoreland, Lynn A. [R-GA-3] 12/16/2013
Rep. Black, Diane [R-TN-6] 12/16/2013
Rep. Whitfield, Ed [R-KY-1] 12/16/2013
Rep. Capito, Shelley Moore [R-WV-2] 12/16/2013
Rep. Valadao, David G. [R-CA-21] 12/19/2013
Rep. Huelskamp, Tim [R-KS-1] 12/19/2013
Rep. Carney, John C., Jr. [D-DE-At Large] 12/19/2013
Rep. Hurt, Robert [R-VA-5] 12/19/2013
Rep. Schwartz, Allyson Y. [D-PA-13] 12/19/2013
Rep. Rahall, Nick J., II [D-WV-3] 12/19/2013
Rep. Mulvaney, Mick [R-SC-5] 12/23/2013
Rep. McCaul, Michael T. [R-TX-10] 12/23/2013
Rep. Carter, John R. [R-TX-31] 12/23/2013
Rep. Griffith, H. Morgan [R-VA-9] 12/23/2013
Rep. Ruiz, Raul [D-CA-36] 12/23/2013
Rep. Massie, Thomas [R-KY-4] 12/23/2013
Rep. Heck, Joseph J. [R-NV-3] 01/08/2014
Rep. Griffin, Tim [R-AR-2] 01/08/2014
Rep. Latta, Robert E. [R-OH-5] 01/08/2014
Rep. Long, Billy [R-MO-7] 01/08/2014
Rep. Womack, Steve [R-AR-3] 01/08/2014
Rep. Schrader, Kurt [D-OR-5] 01/08/2014
Rep. Visclosky, Peter J. [D-IN-1] 01/08/2014
Rep. Van Hollen, Chris [D-MD-8] 01/08/2014
Rep. Rokita, Todd [R-IN-4] 01/09/2014
Rep. Higgins, Brian [D-NY-26] 01/09/2014
Rep. Brooks, Susan W. [R-IN-5] 01/09/2014
Rep. Israel, Steve [D-NY-3] 01/09/2014
Rep. Peters, Gary C. [D-MI-14] 01/09/2014
Rep. Pittenger, Robert [R-NC-9] 01/09/2014
Rep. Wenstrup, Brad R. [R-OH-2] 01/10/2014
Rep. Turner, Michael R. [R-OH-10] 01/10/2014
Rep. Labrador, Raul R. [R-ID-1] 01/10/2014
Rep. Forbes, J. Randy [R-VA-4] 01/13/2014
Rep. DeFazio, Peter A. [D-OR-4] 01/13/2014
Rep. Michaud, Michael H. [D-ME-2] 01/13/2014
Rep. Connolly, Gerald E. [D-VA-11] 01/13/2014
Rep. Fleischmann, Charles J. "Chuck" [R-TN-3] 01/13/2014
Rep. Kilmer, Derek [D-WA-6] 01/13/2014
Rep. Lummis, Cynthia M. [R-WY-At Large] 01/13/2014
Rep. Paulsen, Erik [R-MN-3] 01/15/2014
Rep. Mica, John L. [R-FL-7] 01/15/2014
Rep. Latham, Tom [R-IA-3] 01/15/2014
Rep. Poe, Ted [R-TX-2] 01/15/2014
Rep. Bonamici, Suzanne [D-OR-1] 01/27/2014
Rep. Roby, Martha [R-AL-2] 01/28/2014
Rep. Nunnelee, Alan [R-MS-1] 01/28/2014