Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor

CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Amodei, Mark E. [R-NV-2]* 01/23/2013
Rep. Bachus, Spencer [R-AL-6]* 01/23/2013
Rep. Barr, Andy [R-KY-6]* 01/23/2013
Rep. Bishop, Rob [R-UT-1]* 01/23/2013
Rep. Black, Diane [R-TN-6]* 01/23/2013
Rep. Blackburn, Marsha [R-TN-7]* 01/23/2013
Rep. Bonner, Jo [R-AL-1]* 01/23/2013
Rep. Brooks, Mo [R-AL-5]* 01/23/2013
Rep. Bucshon, Larry [R-IN-8]* 01/23/2013
Rep. Camp, Dave [R-MI-4]* 01/23/2013
Rep. Cassidy, Bill [R-LA-6]* 01/23/2013
Rep. Chabot, Steve [R-OH-1]* 01/23/2013
Rep. Chaffetz, Jason [R-UT-3]* 01/23/2013
Rep. Collins, Doug [R-GA-9]* 01/23/2013
Rep. Cramer, Kevin [R-ND-At Large]* 01/23/2013
Rep. Crawford, Eric A. "Rick" [R-AR-1]* 01/23/2013
Rep. Davis, Rodney [R-IL-13]* 01/23/2013
Rep. DeSantis, Ron [R-FL-6]* 01/23/2013
Rep. DesJarlais, Scott [R-TN-4]* 01/23/2013
Rep. Duncan, John J., Jr. [R-TN-2]* 01/23/2013
Rep. Duncan, Jeff [R-SC-3]* 01/23/2013
Rep. Fitzpatrick, Michael G. [R-PA-8]* 01/23/2013
Rep. Forbes, J. Randy [R-VA-4]* 01/23/2013
Rep. Fortenberry, Jeff [R-NE-1]* 01/23/2013
Rep. Garrett, Scott [R-NJ-5]* 01/23/2013
Rep. Gerlach, Jim [R-PA-6]* 01/23/2013
Rep. Gibbs, Bob [R-OH-18]* 01/23/2013
Rep. Gingrey, Phil [R-GA-11]* 01/23/2013
Rep. Gosar, Paul A. [R-AZ-4]* 01/23/2013
Rep. Gowdy, Trey [R-SC-4]* 01/23/2013
Rep. Graves, Sam [R-MO-6]* 01/23/2013
Rep. Griffin, Tim [R-AR-2]* 01/23/2013
Rep. Guthrie, Brett [R-KY-2]* 01/23/2013
Rep. Hanna, Richard L. [R-NY-22]* 01/23/2013
Rep. Harper, Gregg [R-MS-3]* 01/23/2013
Rep. Hartzler, Vicky [R-MO-4]* 01/23/2013
Rep. Holding, George [R-NC-13]* 01/23/2013
Rep. Hudson, Richard [R-NC-8]* 01/23/2013
Rep. Huelskamp, Tim [R-KS-1]* 01/23/2013
Rep. Huizenga, Bill [R-MI-2]* 01/23/2013
Rep. Hultgren, Randy [R-IL-14]* 01/23/2013
Rep. Jenkins, Lynn [R-KS-2]* 01/23/2013
Rep. Johnson, Bill [R-OH-6]* 01/23/2013
Rep. Jones, Walter B., Jr. [R-NC-3]* 01/23/2013
Rep. Kelly, Mike [R-PA-3]* 01/23/2013
Rep. Kline, John [R-MN-2]* 01/23/2013
Rep. Lamborn, Doug [R-CO-5]* 01/23/2013
Rep. Latham, Tom [R-IA-3]* 01/23/2013
Rep. Latta, Robert E. [R-OH-5]* 01/23/2013
Rep. Long, Billy [R-MO-7]* 01/23/2013
Rep. Luetkemeyer, Blaine [R-MO-3]* 01/23/2013
Rep. Lummis, Cynthia M. [R-WY-At Large]* 01/23/2013
Rep. Massie, Thomas [R-KY-4]* 01/23/2013
Rep. McKinley, David B. [R-WV-1]* 01/23/2013
Rep. Messer, Luke [R-IN-6]* 01/23/2013
Rep. Miller, Jeff [R-FL-1]* 01/23/2013
Rep. Capito, Shelley Moore [R-WV-2]* 01/23/2013
Rep. Mullin, Markwayne [R-OK-2]* 01/23/2013
Rep. Mulvaney, Mick [R-SC-5]* 01/23/2013
Rep. Neugebauer, Randy [R-TX-19]* 01/23/2013
Rep. Noem, Kristi L. [R-SD-At Large]* 01/23/2013
Rep. Nugent, Richard B. [R-FL-11]* 01/23/2013
Rep. Nunnelee, Alan [R-MS-1]* 01/23/2013
Rep. Olson, Pete [R-TX-22]* 01/23/2013
Rep. Pearce, Stevan [R-NM-2]* 01/23/2013
Rep. Reed, Tom [R-NY-23]* 01/23/2013
Rep. Ribble, Reid J. [R-WI-8]* 01/23/2013
Rep. Roe, David P. [R-TN-1]* 01/23/2013
Rep. Rogers, Mike J. [R-MI-8]* 01/23/2013
Rep. Rokita, Todd [R-IN-4]* 01/23/2013
Rep. Scalise, Steve [R-LA-1]* 01/23/2013
Rep. Schock, Aaron [R-IL-18]* 01/23/2013
Rep. Sensenbrenner, F. James, Jr. [R-WI-5]* 01/23/2013
Rep. Simpson, Michael K. [R-ID-2]* 01/23/2013
Rep. Smith, Lamar [R-TX-21]* 01/23/2013
Rep. Smith, Adrian [R-NE-3]* 01/23/2013
Rep. Stockman, Steve [R-TX-36]* 01/23/2013
Rep. Stutzman, Marlin A. [R-IN-3]* 01/23/2013
Rep. Thornberry, Mac [R-TX-13]* 01/23/2013
Rep. Tiberi, Patrick J. [R-OH-12]* 01/23/2013
Rep. Walberg, Tim [R-MI-7]* 01/23/2013
Rep. Walden, Greg [R-OR-2]* 01/23/2013
Rep. Webster, Daniel [R-FL-10]* 01/23/2013
Rep. Westmoreland, Lynn A. [R-GA-3]* 01/23/2013
Rep. Wilson, Joe [R-SC-2]* 01/23/2013
Rep. Yoder, Kevin [R-KS-3]* 01/23/2013
Rep. Yoho, Ted S. [R-FL-3]* 01/23/2013
Rep. Young, Don [R-AK-At Large]* 01/23/2013
Rep. Kinzinger, Adam [R-IL-16]* 01/23/2013
Rep. Stivers, Steve [R-OH-15]* 01/23/2013
Rep. Tipton, Scott R. [R-CO-3]* 01/23/2013
Rep. Gibson, Christopher P. [R-NY-19]* 01/23/2013
Rep. Boustany, Charles W., Jr. [R-LA-3]* 01/23/2013
Rep. Poe, Ted [R-TX-2]* 01/23/2013
Rep. Gardner, Cory [R-CO-4]* 01/23/2013
Rep. Schweikert, David [R-AZ-6]* 01/23/2013
Rep. Franks, Trent [R-AZ-8]* 01/23/2013
Rep. Hall, Ralph M. [R-TX-4]* 01/23/2013
Rep. Renacci, James B. [R-OH-16]* 01/23/2013
Rep. Palazzo, Steven M. [R-MS-4]* 01/23/2013
Rep. Roskam, Peter J. [R-IL-6]* 01/23/2013
Rep. Marino, Tom [R-PA-10]* 01/23/2013
Rep. Posey, Bill [R-FL-8]* 01/23/2013
Rep. Roby, Martha [R-AL-2]* 01/23/2013
Rep. Flores, Bill [R-TX-17]* 01/23/2013
Rep. Barton, Joe [R-TX-6]* 01/23/2013
Rep. Calvert, Ken [R-CA-42]* 01/23/2013
Rep. Denham, Jeff [R-CA-10]* 01/23/2013
Rep. Barletta, Lou [R-PA-11]* 01/23/2013
Rep. Alexander, Rodney [R-LA-5]* 01/23/2013
Rep. Aderholt, Robert B. [R-AL-4]* 01/23/2013
Rep. Valadao, David G. [R-CA-21]* 01/23/2013
Rep. Gohmert, Louie [R-TX-1]* 01/23/2013
Rep. Coffman, Mike [R-CO-6]* 01/23/2013
Rep. Upton, Fred [R-MI-6]* 01/23/2013
Rep. Sessions, Pete [R-TX-32]* 01/23/2013
Rep. Wagner, Ann [R-MO-2]* 01/23/2013
Rep. King, Steve [R-IA-4]* 01/23/2013
Rep. Brooks, Susan W. [R-IN-5]* 01/23/2013
Rep. Benishek, Dan [R-MI-1]* 01/23/2013
Rep. Ross, Dennis A. [R-FL-15]* 01/23/2013
Rep. McHenry, Patrick T. [R-NC-10] 01/25/2013
Rep. Mica, John L. [R-FL-7] 01/25/2013
Rep. Hensarling, Jeb [R-TX-5] 01/25/2013
Rep. Murphy, Tim [R-PA-18] 01/25/2013
Rep. Granger, Kay [R-TX-12] 01/25/2013
Rep. Radel, Trey [R-FL-19] 01/25/2013
Rep. McClintock, Tom [R-CA-4] 01/25/2013
Rep. Meadows, Mark [R-NC-11] 01/29/2013
Rep. Wenstrup, Brad R. [R-OH-2] 01/29/2013
Rep. Cotton, Tom [R-AR-4] 01/29/2013
Rep. Culberson, John Abney [R-TX-7] 02/04/2013
Rep. LaMalfa, Doug [R-CA-1] 02/04/2013
Rep. Wittman, Robert J. [R-VA-1] 02/05/2013
Rep. Paulsen, Erik [R-MN-3] 02/05/2013
Rep. Graves, Tom [R-GA-14] 02/08/2013
Rep. Kingston, Jack [R-GA-1] 02/08/2013
Rep. Rothfus, Keith J. [R-PA-12] 02/08/2013
Rep. Rigell, E. Scott [R-VA-2] 02/12/2013
Rep. Diaz-Balart, Mario [R-FL-25] 02/12/2013
Rep. Walorski, Jackie [R-IN-2] 02/12/2013
Rep. Salmon, Matt [R-AZ-5] 02/15/2013
Rep. McCaul, Michael T. [R-TX-10] 02/15/2013
Rep. Pittenger, Robert [R-NC-9] 02/25/2013
Rep. Young, C. W. Bill [R-FL-13] 02/25/2013
Rep. Farenthold, Blake [R-TX-27] 03/05/2013
Rep. Lankford, James [R-OK-5] 03/14/2013
Rep. Ryan, Paul [R-WI-1] 03/25/2013
Rep. Bridenstine, Jim [R-OK-1] 04/11/2013
Rep. Coble, Howard [R-NC-6] 04/11/2013
Rep. Rice, Tom [R-SC-7] 04/16/2013
Rep. Bachmann, Michele [R-MN-6] 05/07/2013
Rep. Weber, Randy K. Sr. [R-TX-14] 05/07/2013
Rep. Daines, Steve [R-MT-At Large] 05/15/2013
Rep. Marchant, Kenny [R-TX-24] 05/16/2013
Rep. Scott, Austin [R-GA-8] 06/04/2013
Rep. Terry, Lee [R-NE-2] 06/05/2013
Rep. Herrera Beutler, Jaime [R-WA-3] 06/06/2013
Rep. Duffy, Sean P. [R-WI-7] 06/06/2013
Rep. Brady, Kevin [R-TX-8] 06/12/2013
Rep. Nunes, Devin [R-CA-22] 06/24/2013
Rep. Fleischmann, Charles J. "Chuck" [R-TN-3] 07/08/2013
Rep. Pompeo, Mike [R-KS-4] 07/10/2013
Rep. Smith, Jason T. [R-MO-8] 07/19/2013