Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor

CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Goodlatte, Bob [R-VA-6]* 12/05/2013
Rep. Polis, Jared [D-CO-2]* 12/05/2013
Rep. Johnson, Henry C. "Hank," Jr. [D-GA-4]* 12/05/2013
Rep. Moore, Gwen [D-WI-4]* 12/05/2013
Rep. Larsen, Rick [D-WA-2] 01/14/2014
Rep. Lewis, John [D-GA-5] 01/14/2014
Rep. Ellison, Keith [D-MN-5] 01/15/2014
Rep. Van Hollen, Chris [D-MD-8] 01/15/2014
Rep. Shea-Porter, Carol [D-NH-1] 01/27/2014
Rep. Norton, Eleanor Holmes [D-DC-At Large] 03/11/2014
Rep. Scott, David [D-GA-13] 03/18/2014
Rep. Barrow, John [D-GA-12] 04/01/2014
Rep. Neal, Richard E. [D-MA-1] 04/10/2014