Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor

CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Braley, Bruce L. [D-IA-1] 12/10/2013
Rep. Cardenas, Tony [D-CA-29] 01/09/2014
Rep. Carson, Andre [D-IN-7] 01/28/2014
Rep. Takano, Mark [D-CA-41] 01/28/2014
Rep. O'Rourke, Beto [D-TX-16] 02/10/2014
Rep. Jackson Lee, Sheila [D-TX-18] 02/26/2014
Rep. Honda, Michael M. [D-CA-17] 02/26/2014