Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor

CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. King, Peter T. [R-NY-2]* 12/03/2013
Rep. Conyers, John, Jr. [D-MI-13] 12/04/2013
Rep. Langevin, James R. [D-RI-2] 12/04/2013
Rep. Esty, Elizabeth H. [D-CT-5] 12/16/2013
Rep. Himes, James A. [D-CT-4] 01/14/2014
Rep. Tierney, John F. [D-MA-6] 02/27/2014