Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor

CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Weber, Randy K. Sr. [R-TX-14] 01/09/2014
Rep. Johnson, Sam [R-TX-3] 01/09/2014
Rep. Williams, Roger [R-TX-25] 01/10/2014
Rep. Stockman, Steve [R-TX-36] 01/10/2014
Rep. Farenthold, Blake [R-TX-27] 01/10/2014
Rep. Carter, John R. [R-TX-31] 01/14/2014
Rep. Hall, Ralph M. [R-TX-4] 01/15/2014
Rep. Burgess, Michael C. [R-TX-26] 01/15/2014
Rep. Culberson, John Abney [R-TX-7] 01/29/2014
Rep. Marchant, Kenny [R-TX-24] 01/29/2014
Rep. Poe, Ted [R-TX-2] 02/03/2014
Rep. Smith, Lamar [R-TX-21] 02/03/2014