Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor

CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. McMorris Rodgers, Cathy [R-WA-5]* 11/21/2013
Rep. Michaud, Michael H. [D-ME-2] 01/07/2014
Rep. Jones, Walter B., Jr. [R-NC-3] 01/07/2014
Rep. Conyers, John, Jr. [D-MI-13] 01/07/2014
Rep. Honda, Michael M. [D-CA-17] 01/07/2014
Rep. Garcia, Joe [D-FL-26] 01/07/2014
Rep. Wilson, Frederica S. [D-FL-24] 01/07/2014
Rep. Bustos, Cheri [D-IL-17] 01/07/2014
Rep. Murphy, Patrick [D-FL-18] 01/07/2014
Rep. Peters, Scott H. [D-CA-52] 01/14/2014
Rep. Scott, Robert C. "Bobby" [D-VA-3] 01/21/2014
Rep. Esty, Elizabeth H. [D-CT-5] 01/21/2014
Rep. Garamendi, John [D-CA-3] 01/21/2014
Rep. Hastings, Alcee L. [D-FL-20] 01/21/2014
Rep. Rangel, Charles B. [D-NY-13] 01/21/2014
Rep. Maloney, Sean Patrick [D-NY-18] 01/21/2014
Rep. Ellmers, Renee L. [R-NC-2] 01/28/2014
Rep. Miller, Candice S. [R-MI-10] 01/31/2014
Rep. Serrano, Jose E. [D-NY-15] 01/31/2014
Rep. Takano, Mark [D-CA-41] 01/31/2014
Rep. McNerney, Jerry [D-CA-9] 01/31/2014
Rep. Brown, Corrine [D-FL-5] 01/31/2014
Rep. Sinema, Kyrsten [D-AZ-9] 01/31/2014
Rep. Bass, Karen [D-CA-37] 02/04/2014
Rep. Chu, Judy [D-CA-27] 02/04/2014
Rep. Jackson Lee, Sheila [D-TX-18] 02/04/2014
Rep. McGovern, James P. [D-MA-2] 02/04/2014
Rep. Holt, Rush [D-NJ-12] 02/04/2014
Rep. Slaughter, Louise McIntosh [D-NY-25] 02/21/2014
Rep. Frankel, Lois [D-FL-22] 02/21/2014
Rep. Meeks, Gregory W. [D-NY-5] 02/21/2014
Rep. Connolly, Gerald E. [D-VA-11] 02/21/2014
Rep. Cartwright, Matt [D-PA-17] 02/21/2014
Rep. Kirkpatrick, Ann [D-AZ-1] 02/21/2014
Rep. Vargas, Juan [D-CA-51] 02/21/2014
Rep. O'Rourke, Beto [D-TX-16] 02/28/2014
Rep. Brownley, Julia [D-CA-26] 02/28/2014
Rep. Bordallo, Madeleine Z. [D-GU-At Large] 03/05/2014
Rep. Johnson, Henry C. "Hank," Jr. [D-GA-4] 03/05/2014
Rep. Lowey, Nita M. [D-NY-17] 03/05/2014
Rep. Roe, David P. [R-TN-1] 03/06/2014
Rep. Perry, Scott [R-PA-4] 03/06/2014
Rep. Posey, Bill [R-FL-8] 03/11/2014
Rep. Rahall, Nick J., II [D-WV-3] 03/11/2014
Rep. Tierney, John F. [D-MA-6] 03/11/2014
Rep. Thompson, Glenn [R-PA-5] 03/11/2014
Rep. Sewell, Terri A. [D-AL-7] 03/11/2014
Rep. Marino, Tom [R-PA-10] 03/13/2014
Rep. Edwards, Donna F. [D-MD-4] 03/13/2014
Rep. Cole, Tom [R-OK-4] 03/13/2014
Rep. Kilmer, Derek [D-WA-6] 03/24/2014
Rep. Buchanan, Vern [R-FL-16] 03/24/2014
Rep. Sires, Albio [D-NJ-8] 03/24/2014
Rep. Stivers, Steve [R-OH-15] 03/24/2014
Rep. Grijalva, Raul M. [D-AZ-3] 03/24/2014
Rep. Keating, William R. [D-MA-9] 03/24/2014
Rep. McDermott, Jim [D-WA-7] 03/24/2014
Rep. Clarke, Yvette D. [D-NY-9] 03/24/2014
Rep. Loebsack, David [D-IA-2] 03/24/2014
Rep. Hanabusa, Colleen W. [D-HI-1] 03/24/2014
Rep. Schock, Aaron [R-IL-18] 03/27/2014
Rep. Enyart, William L. [D-IL-12] 03/27/2014
Rep. Price, David E. [D-NC-4] 04/02/2014
Rep. Cleaver, Emanuel [D-MO-5] 04/02/2014
Rep. Ruiz, Raul [D-CA-36] 04/02/2014
Rep. Schiff, Adam B. [D-CA-28] 04/02/2014
Rep. DelBene, Suzan K. [D-WA-1] 04/07/2014
Rep. Green, Al [D-TX-9] 04/07/2014