Refine your search

You searched for:

HR3124 Remove

* = Original cosponsor

CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Bordallo, Madeleine Z. [D-GU-At Large]* 11/21/2013
Rep. Grijalva, Raul M. [D-AZ-3]* 11/21/2013
Rep. Roybal-Allard, Lucille [D-CA-40]* 11/21/2013
Rep. Lee, Barbara [D-CA-13]* 11/21/2013
Rep. Christensen, Donna M. [D-VI-At Large]* 11/21/2013
Rep. Hahn, Janice [D-CA-44]* 11/21/2013
Rep. Hinojosa, Ruben [D-TX-15]* 11/21/2013
Rep. Norton, Eleanor Holmes [D-DC-At Large]* 11/21/2013
Rep. Brown, Corrine [D-FL-5]* 11/21/2013
Rep. Jackson Lee, Sheila [D-TX-18]* 11/21/2013
Rep. Beatty, Joyce [D-OH-3]* 11/21/2013
Rep. Conyers, John, Jr. [D-MI-13]* 11/21/2013
Rep. Clarke, Yvette D. [D-NY-9]* 11/21/2013
Rep. Hastings, Alcee L. [D-FL-20]* 11/21/2013
Rep. Rangel, Charles B. [D-NY-13]* 11/21/2013
Rep. Payne, Donald M., Jr. [D-NJ-10]* 11/21/2013
Rep. Ellison, Keith [D-MN-5]* 11/21/2013
Rep. Wilson, Frederica S. [D-FL-24]* 11/21/2013
Rep. Bishop, Sanford D., Jr. [D-GA-2]* 11/21/2013
Rep. Lujan Grisham, Michelle [D-NM-1]* 11/21/2013
Rep. Cardenas, Tony [D-CA-29]* 11/21/2013
Rep. Green, Al [D-TX-9]* 11/21/2013
Rep. Sewell, Terri A. [D-AL-7]* 11/21/2013
Rep. Faleomavaega, Eni F. H. [D-AS-At Large]* 11/21/2013
Rep. Sanchez, Loretta [D-CA-46]* 11/21/2013
Rep. Cummings, Elijah E. [D-MD-7]* 11/21/2013
Rep. Davis, Danny K. [D-IL-7]* 11/21/2013
Rep. Engel, Eliot L. [D-NY-16]* 11/21/2013
Rep. Chu, Judy [D-CA-27]* 11/21/2013
Rep. McCollum, Betty [D-MN-4]* 11/21/2013
Rep. Cohen, Steve [D-TN-9]* 11/21/2013
Rep. Brady, Robert A. [D-PA-1]* 11/21/2013
Rep. Meeks, Gregory W. [D-NY-5]* 11/21/2013
Rep. Honda, Michael M. [D-CA-17]* 11/21/2013
Rep. Vela, Filemon [D-TX-34]* 11/21/2013
Rep. Lewis, John [D-GA-5]* 11/21/2013
Rep. Rush, Bobby L. [D-IL-1]* 11/21/2013
Rep. Serrano, Jose E. [D-NY-15]* 11/21/2013
Rep. Moore, Gwen [D-WI-4]* 11/21/2013
Rep. Takano, Mark [D-CA-41]* 11/21/2013
Rep. Enyart, William L. [D-IL-12]* 11/21/2013
Rep. Schakowsky, Janice D. [D-IL-9] 12/05/2013
Rep. Johnson, Henry C. "Hank," Jr. [D-GA-4] 12/05/2013
Rep. Pierluisi, Pedro R. [D-PR-At Large] 12/05/2013
Rep. Clay, Wm. Lacy [D-MO-1] 12/05/2013
Rep. McGovern, James P. [D-MA-2] 12/05/2013
Rep. Castor, Kathy [D-FL-14] 12/12/2013
Rep. Nadler, Jerrold [D-NY-10] 12/12/2013
Rep. Kildee, Daniel T [D-MI-5] 12/16/2013
Rep. Butterfield, G. K. [D-NC-1] 02/25/2014
Rep. Scott, David [D-GA-13] 02/25/2014