Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor

CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Thompson, Bennie G. [D-MS-2]* 11/21/2013
Rep. Wittman, Robert J. [R-VA-1]* 11/21/2013
Rep. Walz, Timothy J. [D-MN-1]* 11/21/2013
Rep. Young, Don [R-AK-At Large] 12/04/2013
Rep. Benishek, Dan [R-MI-1] 12/04/2013
Rep. Hanna, Richard L. [R-NY-22] 12/05/2013
Rep. Simpson, Michael K. [R-ID-2] 12/10/2013
Rep. Gingrey, Phil [R-GA-11] 12/10/2013
Rep. Crawford, Eric A. "Rick" [R-AR-1] 12/10/2013
Rep. Jenkins, Lynn [R-KS-2] 12/10/2013
Rep. Walberg, Tim [R-MI-7] 12/10/2013
Rep. Bishop, Rob [R-UT-1] 12/10/2013
Rep. Boustany, Charles W., Jr. [R-LA-3] 12/11/2013
Rep. Kline, John [R-MN-2] 12/11/2013
Rep. Cook, Paul [R-CA-8] 12/11/2013
Rep. Cole, Tom [R-OK-4] 12/11/2013
Rep. Marchant, Kenny [R-TX-24] 12/11/2013
Rep. Hartzler, Vicky [R-MO-4] 12/11/2013
Rep. Bucshon, Larry [R-IN-8] 12/11/2013
Rep. Johnson, Bill [R-OH-6] 12/11/2013
Rep. Calvert, Ken [R-CA-42] 12/12/2013
Rep. Miller, Candice S. [R-MI-10] 12/12/2013
Rep. Bachus, Spencer [R-AL-6] 12/12/2013
Rep. Johnson, Sam [R-TX-3] 12/12/2013
Rep. Miller, Jeff [R-FL-1] 12/12/2013
Rep. Poe, Ted [R-TX-2] 12/12/2013
Rep. Peterson, Collin C. [D-MN-7] 12/12/2013
Rep. Long, Billy [R-MO-7] 12/12/2013
Rep. Collins, Chris [R-NY-27] 12/12/2013
Rep. Cramer, Kevin [R-ND-At Large] 12/12/2013
Rep. Kinzinger, Adam [R-IL-16] 12/12/2013
Rep. Schock, Aaron [R-IL-18] 12/12/2013
Rep. Sessions, Pete [R-TX-32] 12/12/2013
Rep. Pompeo, Mike [R-KS-4] 12/12/2013
Rep. Hunter, Duncan D. [R-CA-50] 12/12/2013
Rep. Coble, Howard [R-NC-6] 12/12/2013
Rep. Pearce, Stevan [R-NM-2] 12/12/2013
Rep. Schweikert, David [R-AZ-6] 12/12/2013
Rep. Daines, Steve [R-MT-At Large] 12/19/2013
Rep. Gosar, Paul A. [R-AZ-4] 01/07/2014
Rep. Bishop, Sanford D., Jr. [D-GA-2] 01/07/2014
Rep. Thornberry, Mac [R-TX-13] 01/07/2014
Rep. Lummis, Cynthia M. [R-WY-At Large] 01/07/2014
Rep. Huizenga, Bill [R-MI-2] 01/07/2014
Rep. Westmoreland, Lynn A. [R-GA-3] 01/07/2014
Rep. Brooks, Susan W. [R-IN-5] 01/07/2014
Rep. Tipton, Scott R. [R-CO-3] 01/10/2014
Rep. McIntyre, Mike [D-NC-7] 01/10/2014
Rep. Cotton, Tom [R-AR-4] 01/10/2014
Rep. Fleischmann, Charles J. "Chuck" [R-TN-3] 01/10/2014
Rep. Luetkemeyer, Blaine [R-MO-3] 01/10/2014
Rep. Hall, Ralph M. [R-TX-4] 01/10/2014
Rep. Wenstrup, Brad R. [R-OH-2] 01/10/2014
Rep. Hudson, Richard [R-NC-8] 01/10/2014
Rep. Burgess, Michael C. [R-TX-26] 01/10/2014
Rep. Kind, Ron [D-WI-3] 01/10/2014
Rep. Reed, Tom [R-NY-23] 01/13/2014
Rep. Nugent, Richard B. [R-FL-11] 01/13/2014
Rep. Owens, William L. [D-NY-21] 01/13/2014
Rep. Franks, Trent [R-AZ-8] 01/15/2014
Rep. Kingston, Jack [R-GA-1] 01/15/2014
Rep. Duncan, John J., Jr. [R-TN-2] 01/16/2014
Rep. DesJarlais, Scott [R-TN-4] 01/16/2014
Rep. King, Steve [R-IA-4] 01/16/2014
Rep. Bilirakis, Gus M. [R-FL-12] 01/27/2014
Rep. Southerland, Steve II [R-FL-2] 01/27/2014
Rep. Latham, Tom [R-IA-3] 01/27/2014
Rep. Barrow, John [D-GA-12] 01/27/2014
Rep. Wilson, Joe [R-SC-2] 01/27/2014
Rep. Ross, Dennis A. [R-FL-15] 01/27/2014
Rep. Davis, Rodney [R-IL-13] 01/27/2014
Rep. Terry, Lee [R-NE-2] 01/27/2014
Rep. Young, Todd C. [R-IN-9] 01/28/2014
Rep. Nunnelee, Alan [R-MS-1] 01/28/2014
Rep. Roe, David P. [R-TN-1] 02/03/2014
Rep. Ryan, Tim [D-OH-13] 02/03/2014
Rep. Fleming, John [R-LA-4] 02/03/2014
Rep. Byrne, Bradley [R-AL-1] 02/03/2014
Rep. Rokita, Todd [R-IN-4] 02/03/2014
Rep. Turner, Michael R. [R-OH-10] 02/03/2014
Rep. Rooney, Thomas J. [R-FL-17] 02/03/2014
Rep. Carter, John R. [R-TX-31] 02/03/2014
Rep. Stockman, Steve [R-TX-36] 02/03/2014
Rep. Smith, Adrian [R-NE-3] 02/04/2014
Rep. Mica, John L. [R-FL-7] 02/04/2014
Rep. Barr, Andy [R-KY-6] 02/04/2014