Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor

CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Michaud, Michael H. [D-ME-2]* 01/23/2013
Rep. Jones, Walter B., Jr. [R-NC-3] 02/04/2013
Rep. Griffin, Tim [R-AR-2] 02/04/2013
Rep. Nugent, Richard B. [R-FL-11] 02/04/2013
Rep. Pastor, Ed [D-AZ-7] 02/06/2013
Rep. O'Rourke, Beto [D-TX-16] 02/06/2013
Rep. Ross, Dennis A. [R-FL-12] 02/25/2013
Rep. Hunter, Duncan D. [R-CA-50] 02/25/2013
Rep. McCarthy, Carolyn [D-NY-4] 02/25/2013
Rep. Wilson, Joe [R-SC-2] 02/25/2013
Rep. Collins, Chris [R-NY-27] 03/04/2013
Rep. Cicilline, David N. [D-RI-1] 03/06/2013
Rep. Cole, Tom [R-OK-4] 03/06/2013
Rep. Ruiz, Raul [D-CA-36] 03/06/2013
Rep. Wilson, Frederica S. [D-FL-24] 03/12/2013
Rep. LoBiondo, Frank A. [R-NJ-2] 03/12/2013
Rep. Lamborn, Doug [R-CO-5] 03/12/2013
Rep. Peterson, Collin C. [D-MN-7] 03/12/2013
Rep. Frankel, Lois [D-FL-22] 03/12/2013
Rep. Walz, Timothy J. [D-MN-1] 03/12/2013
Rep. Shea-Porter, Carol [D-NH-1] 03/14/2013
Rep. Titus, Dina [D-NV-1] 03/14/2013
Rep. Young, Don [R-AK-At Large] 03/14/2013
Rep. Sewell, Terri A. [D-AL-7] 03/14/2013
Rep. Takano, Mark [D-CA-41] 03/19/2013
Rep. Johnson, Bill [R-OH-6] 03/19/2013
Rep. Courtney, Joe [D-CT-2] 03/19/2013
Rep. Honda, Michael M. [D-CA-17] 03/21/2013
Rep. Stivers, Steve [R-OH-15] 04/09/2013
Rep. Negrete McLeod, Gloria [D-CA-35] 04/09/2013
Rep. Schwartz, Allyson Y. [D-PA-13] 04/09/2013
Rep. Bishop, Timothy H. [D-NY-1] 04/09/2013
Rep. Carson, Andre [D-IN-7] 04/09/2013
Rep. Kirkpatrick, Ann [D-AZ-1] 04/09/2013
Rep. Kuster, Ann M. [D-NH-2] 04/09/2013
Rep. Benishek, Dan [R-MI-1] 04/09/2013
Rep. Holt, Rush [D-NJ-12] 04/11/2013
Rep. Latta, Robert E. [R-OH-5] 04/11/2013
Rep. Bilirakis, Gus M. [R-FL-12] 04/11/2013
Rep. Amodei, Mark E. [R-NV-2] 04/11/2013
Rep. Runyan, Jon [R-NJ-3] 04/17/2013
Rep. Forbes, J. Randy [R-VA-4] 04/26/2013
Rep. Barber, Ron [D-AZ-2] 05/07/2013
Rep. Roe, David P. [R-TN-1] 05/08/2013
Rep. Peters, Scott H. [D-CA-52] 05/08/2013
Rep. Brownley, Julia [D-CA-26] 05/08/2013
Rep. Walorski, Jackie [R-IN-2] 05/08/2013
Rep. Messer, Luke [R-IN-6] 05/15/2013
Rep. Sinema, Kyrsten [D-AZ-9] 05/23/2013
Rep. Gerlach, Jim [R-PA-6] 05/23/2013