Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor

CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. DeFazio, Peter A. [D-OR-4]* 11/20/2013
Rep. Grimm, Michael G. [R-NY-11] 12/03/2013
Rep. Grijalva, Raul M. [D-AZ-3] 12/03/2013
Rep. Nadler, Jerrold [D-NY-10] 12/03/2013
Rep. Moran, James P. [D-VA-8] 12/03/2013
Rep. Slaughter, Louise McIntosh [D-NY-25] 12/03/2013
Rep. Neal, Richard E. [D-MA-1] 12/05/2013
Rep. Connolly, Gerald E. [D-VA-11] 12/05/2013
Rep. Quigley, Mike [D-IL-5] 12/05/2013
Rep. Shea-Porter, Carol [D-NH-1] 12/05/2013
Rep. LoBiondo, Frank A. [R-NJ-2] 12/05/2013
Rep. Blumenauer, Earl [D-OR-3] 12/19/2013
Rep. Schakowsky, Janice D. [D-IL-9] 01/08/2014
Rep. Farr, Sam [D-CA-20] 02/03/2014
Rep. Campbell, John [R-CA-45] 02/03/2014
Rep. Napolitano, Grace F. [D-CA-32] 02/10/2014
Rep. Clay, Wm. Lacy [D-MO-1] 02/10/2014
Rep. Deutch, Theodore E. [D-FL-21] 02/10/2014
Rep. Ryan, Tim [D-OH-13] 02/10/2014
Rep. Bordallo, Madeleine Z. [D-GU-At Large] 02/10/2014
Rep. Frelinghuysen, Rodney P. [R-NJ-11] 02/10/2014
Rep. McDermott, Jim [D-WA-7] 02/10/2014
Rep. Polis, Jared [D-CO-2] 02/11/2014
Rep. McNerney, Jerry [D-CA-9] 02/26/2014
Rep. Chu, Judy [D-CA-27] 02/26/2014
Rep. Lofgren, Zoe [D-CA-19] 02/26/2014
Rep. Edwards, Donna F. [D-MD-4] 02/26/2014
Rep. Cardenas, Tony [D-CA-29] 02/26/2014
Rep. Hastings, Alcee L. [D-FL-20] 02/26/2014
Rep. Lowey, Nita M. [D-NY-17] 02/26/2014
Rep. Tierney, John F. [D-MA-6] 03/05/2014
Rep. Ellison, Keith [D-MN-5] 03/05/2014
Rep. Engel, Eliot L. [D-NY-16] 03/11/2014
Rep. Whitfield, Ed [R-KY-1] 03/14/2014