Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor

CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Doggett, Lloyd [D-TX-35]* 11/20/2013
Rep. Rangel, Charles B. [D-NY-13]* 11/20/2013
Rep. McDermott, Jim [D-WA-7]* 11/20/2013
Rep. Lewis, John [D-GA-5]* 11/20/2013
Rep. Neal, Richard E. [D-MA-1]* 11/20/2013
Rep. Becerra, Xavier [D-CA-34]* 11/20/2013
Rep. Thompson, Mike [D-CA-5]* 11/20/2013
Rep. Larson, John B. [D-CT-1]* 11/20/2013
Rep. Blumenauer, Earl [D-OR-3]* 11/20/2013
Rep. Kind, Ron [D-WI-3]* 11/20/2013
Rep. Pascrell, Bill, Jr. [D-NJ-9]* 11/20/2013
Rep. Crowley, Joseph [D-NY-14]* 11/20/2013
Rep. Schwartz, Allyson Y. [D-PA-13]* 11/20/2013
Rep. Davis, Danny K. [D-IL-7]* 11/20/2013
Rep. Sanchez, Linda T. [D-CA-38]* 11/20/2013
Rep. Van Hollen, Chris [D-MD-8]* 11/20/2013
Rep. Lee, Barbara [D-CA-13]* 11/20/2013
Rep. Shea-Porter, Carol [D-NH-1]* 11/20/2013
Rep. Cicilline, David N. [D-RI-1]* 11/20/2013
Rep. Fudge, Marcia L. [D-OH-11]* 11/20/2013
Rep. Cohen, Steve [D-TN-9] 11/22/2013
Rep. Michaud, Michael H. [D-ME-2] 11/22/2013
Rep. Pallone, Frank, Jr. [D-NJ-6] 11/22/2013
Rep. Langevin, James R. [D-RI-2] 11/22/2013
Rep. Kuster, Ann M. [D-NH-2] 11/22/2013
Rep. Keating, William R. [D-MA-9] 11/22/2013
Rep. Takano, Mark [D-CA-41] 11/22/2013
Rep. McGovern, James P. [D-MA-2] 11/22/2013
Rep. Cartwright, Matt [D-PA-17] 11/22/2013
Rep. Tierney, John F. [D-MA-6] 12/02/2013
Rep. Cummings, Elijah E. [D-MD-7] 12/02/2013
Rep. Moran, James P. [D-VA-8] 12/02/2013
Rep. Schakowsky, Janice D. [D-IL-9] 12/02/2013
Rep. Slaughter, Louise McIntosh [D-NY-25] 12/02/2013
Rep. Andrews, Robert E. [D-NJ-1] 12/03/2013
Rep. Capuano, Michael E. [D-MA-7] 12/03/2013
Rep. Foster, Bill [D-IL-11] 12/09/2013
Rep. Bishop, Timothy H. [D-NY-1] 12/09/2013
Rep. Pierluisi, Pedro R. [D-PR-At Large] 12/09/2013
Rep. O'Rourke, Beto [D-TX-16] 12/09/2013
Rep. Grijalva, Raul M. [D-AZ-3] 12/09/2013
Rep. Conyers, John, Jr. [D-MI-13] 12/09/2013
Rep. Hinojosa, Ruben [D-TX-15] 12/09/2013
Rep. Miller, George [D-CA-11] 12/09/2013
Rep. Rush, Bobby L. [D-IL-1] 12/09/2013
Rep. Dingell, John D. [D-MI-12] 12/09/2013
Rep. Sires, Albio [D-NJ-8] 12/09/2013
Rep. Peters, Gary C. [D-MI-14] 12/09/2013
Rep. Honda, Michael M. [D-CA-17] 12/09/2013
Rep. Delaney, John K. [D-MD-6] 12/09/2013
Rep. Wilson, Frederica S. [D-FL-24] 12/12/2013
Rep. Rahall, Nick J., II [D-WV-3] 12/12/2013
Rep. Higgins, Brian [D-NY-26] 12/12/2013
Rep. Titus, Dina [D-NV-1] 12/12/2013
Rep. Pocan, Mark [D-WI-2] 12/12/2013
Rep. McCollum, Betty [D-MN-4] 12/12/2013
Rep. Maloney, Sean Patrick [D-NY-18] 12/12/2013
Rep. Carson, Andre [D-IN-7] 12/12/2013
Rep. Kildee, Daniel T [D-MI-5] 12/12/2013
Rep. Velazquez, Nydia M. [D-NY-7] 12/23/2013
Rep. Pingree, Chellie [D-ME-1] 12/23/2013
Rep. Ryan, Tim [D-OH-13] 12/23/2013
Rep. Bonamici, Suzanne [D-OR-1] 12/23/2013
Rep. Kennedy, Joseph P. III [D-MA-4] 12/23/2013
Rep. Lujan Grisham, Michelle [D-NM-1] 12/23/2013
Rep. Norton, Eleanor Holmes [D-DC-At Large] 01/03/2014
Rep. Vargas, Juan [D-CA-51] 01/03/2014
Rep. Clark, Katherine M. [D-MA-5] 01/08/2014
Rep. Grayson, Alan [D-FL-9] 01/09/2014
Rep. Larsen, Rick [D-WA-2] 01/09/2014
Rep. Gabbard, Tulsi [D-HI-2] 01/09/2014
Rep. Huffman, Jared [D-CA-2] 01/09/2014
Rep. Veasey, Marc A. [D-TX-33] 01/10/2014
Rep. Serrano, Jose E. [D-NY-15] 01/15/2014
Rep. Gutierrez, Luis V. [D-IL-4] 01/27/2014
Rep. Chu, Judy [D-CA-27] 02/04/2014
Rep. Clarke, Yvette D. [D-NY-9] 02/10/2014
Rep. Kelly, Robin L. [D-IL-2] 02/10/2014
Rep. Schiff, Adam B. [D-CA-28] 02/10/2014
Rep. Meeks, Gregory W. [D-NY-5] 02/10/2014
Rep. Matsui, Doris O. [D-CA-6] 02/10/2014
Rep. Cardenas, Tony [D-CA-29] 02/10/2014
Rep. Bishop, Sanford D., Jr. [D-GA-2] 02/10/2014
Rep. Negrete McLeod, Gloria [D-CA-35] 02/10/2014
Rep. Brownley, Julia [D-CA-26] 02/11/2014
Rep. Enyart, William L. [D-IL-12] 02/11/2014
Rep. Farr, Sam [D-CA-20] 02/11/2014
Rep. Horsford, Steven A. [D-NV-4] 02/11/2014
Rep. Doyle, Michael F. [D-PA-14] 02/25/2014
Rep. Tsongas, Niki [D-MA-3] 02/27/2014
Rep. Lowenthal, Alan S. [D-CA-47] 02/27/2014
Rep. Hastings, Alcee L. [D-FL-20] 03/10/2014
Rep. Schneider, Bradley S. [D-IL-10] 03/12/2014
Rep. DelBene, Suzan K. [D-WA-1] 03/12/2014
Rep. Green, Gene [D-TX-29] 03/12/2014
Rep. Brady, Robert A. [D-PA-1] 03/12/2014
Rep. Courtney, Joe [D-CT-2] 03/13/2014
Rep. Eshoo, Anna G. [D-CA-18] 04/07/2014
Rep. Jeffries, Hakeem S. [D-NY-8] 04/08/2014