Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor

CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Gardner, Cory [R-CO-4]* 11/19/2013
Rep. Hultgren, Randy [R-IL-14] 11/20/2013
Rep. McClintock, Tom [R-CA-4] 11/20/2013
Rep. Salmon, Matt [R-AZ-5] 11/20/2013
Rep. Harris, Andy [R-MD-1] 11/20/2013
Rep. Massie, Thomas [R-KY-4] 11/20/2013
Rep. Weber, Randy K. Sr. [R-TX-14] 11/20/2013
Rep. Blackburn, Marsha [R-TN-7] 11/20/2013
Rep. Fleming, John [R-LA-4] 11/20/2013
Rep. Rokita, Todd [R-IN-4] 11/20/2013
Rep. Cotton, Tom [R-AR-4] 11/20/2013
Rep. Gowdy, Trey [R-SC-4] 11/20/2013
Rep. Duncan, Jeff [R-SC-3] 11/20/2013
Rep. Duncan, John J., Jr. [R-TN-2] 11/20/2013
Rep. Terry, Lee [R-NE-2] 11/20/2013
Rep. Bridenstine, Jim [R-OK-1] 11/20/2013
Rep. Southerland, Steve II [R-FL-2] 11/20/2013
Rep. Bachus, Spencer [R-AL-6] 11/20/2013
Rep. Westmoreland, Lynn A. [R-GA-3] 11/20/2013
Rep. McHenry, Patrick T. [R-NC-10] 11/20/2013
Rep. Jones, Walter B., Jr. [R-NC-3] 11/21/2013
Rep. Culberson, John Abney [R-TX-7] 11/21/2013
Rep. Crawford, Eric A. "Rick" [R-AR-1] 11/21/2013
Rep. Amash, Justin [R-MI-3] 12/02/2013
Rep. Neugebauer, Randy [R-TX-19] 12/04/2013
Rep. Marino, Tom [R-PA-10] 12/04/2013
Rep. LaMalfa, Doug [R-CA-1] 12/04/2013
Rep. Pittenger, Robert [R-NC-9] 12/04/2013
Rep. Bachmann, Michele [R-MN-6] 12/04/2013
Rep. Mullin, Markwayne [R-OK-2] 12/05/2013
Rep. DeSantis, Ron [R-FL-6] 12/05/2013
Rep. Carter, John R. [R-TX-31] 12/09/2013
Rep. Holding, George [R-NC-13] 01/07/2014
Rep. Ribble, Reid J. [R-WI-8] 01/07/2014
Rep. Gosar, Paul A. [R-AZ-4] 01/07/2014
Rep. Labrador, Raul R. [R-ID-1] 01/07/2014
Rep. Rothfus, Keith J. [R-PA-12] 01/08/2014
Rep. King, Steve [R-IA-4] 01/08/2014
Rep. Franks, Trent [R-AZ-8] 01/08/2014
Rep. Walberg, Tim [R-MI-7] 01/08/2014
Rep. Tiberi, Patrick J. [R-OH-12] 01/10/2014
Rep. Radel, Trey [R-FL-19] 01/13/2014
Rep. Meadows, Mark [R-NC-11] 01/13/2014
Rep. Miller, Jeff [R-FL-1] 01/13/2014
Rep. Broun, Paul C. [R-GA-10] 01/14/2014
Rep. Yoho, Ted S. [R-FL-3] 01/14/2014
Rep. Black, Diane [R-TN-6] 01/14/2014
Rep. Bentivolio, Kerry L. [R-MI-11] 01/14/2014
Rep. Rice, Tom [R-SC-7] 01/15/2014
Rep. Lamborn, Doug [R-CO-5] 01/15/2014
Rep. Boustany, Charles W., Jr. [R-LA-3] 01/15/2014
Rep. Womack, Steve [R-AR-3] 01/16/2014
Rep. Duffy, Sean P. [R-WI-7] 01/27/2014
Rep. Wittman, Robert J. [R-VA-1] 01/27/2014
Rep. Stewart, Chris [R-UT-2] 01/31/2014
Rep. Poe, Ted [R-TX-2] 01/31/2014
Rep. Price, Tom [R-GA-6] 02/03/2014
Rep. Roe, David P. [R-TN-1] 02/04/2014
Rep. Williams, Roger [R-TX-25] 02/04/2014
Rep. Bucshon, Larry [R-IN-8] 02/05/2014
Rep. Sensenbrenner, F. James, Jr. [R-WI-5] 02/11/2014