Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor

CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Blackburn, Marsha [R-TN-7] 11/21/2013
Rep. Franks, Trent [R-AZ-8] 11/21/2013
Rep. Fortenberry, Jeff [R-NE-1] 11/21/2013
Rep. Harris, Andy [R-MD-1] 11/21/2013
Rep. Salmon, Matt [R-AZ-5] 11/21/2013
Rep. Wittman, Robert J. [R-VA-1] 11/21/2013
Rep. Westmoreland, Lynn A. [R-GA-3] 11/21/2013
Rep. Coble, Howard [R-NC-6] 11/21/2013
Rep. Pittenger, Robert [R-NC-9] 11/21/2013
Rep. Holding, George [R-NC-13] 11/21/2013
Rep. Barr, Andy [R-KY-6] 11/21/2013
Rep. Cole, Tom [R-OK-4] 11/21/2013
Rep. Rokita, Todd [R-IN-4] 11/21/2013
Rep. Turner, Michael R. [R-OH-10] 11/21/2013
Rep. Weber, Randy K. Sr. [R-TX-14] 11/21/2013
Rep. Amodei, Mark E. [R-NV-2] 11/21/2013
Rep. Barton, Joe [R-TX-6] 11/21/2013
Rep. Crawford, Eric A. "Rick" [R-AR-1] 11/21/2013
Rep. Duncan, John J., Jr. [R-TN-2] 11/21/2013
Rep. Nunnelee, Alan [R-MS-1] 11/21/2013
Rep. Murphy, Tim [R-PA-18] 11/21/2013
Rep. Meadows, Mark [R-NC-11] 11/21/2013
Rep. Benishek, Dan [R-MI-1] 11/21/2013
Rep. Black, Diane [R-TN-6] 11/21/2013
Rep. Brooks, Mo [R-AL-5] 11/21/2013
Rep. Bucshon, Larry [R-IN-8] 11/21/2013
Rep. Cotton, Tom [R-AR-4] 11/21/2013
Rep. Farenthold, Blake [R-TX-27] 11/21/2013
Rep. Fincher, Stephen Lee [R-TN-8] 11/21/2013
Rep. Gowdy, Trey [R-SC-4] 11/21/2013
Rep. Huelskamp, Tim [R-KS-1] 11/21/2013
Rep. Hultgren, Randy [R-IL-14] 11/21/2013
Rep. Hunter, Duncan D. [R-CA-50] 11/21/2013
Rep. Kline, John [R-MN-2] 11/21/2013
Rep. Labrador, Raul R. [R-ID-1] 11/21/2013
Rep. Lucas, Frank D. [R-OK-3] 11/21/2013
Rep. Marino, Tom [R-PA-10] 11/21/2013
Rep. McHenry, Patrick T. [R-NC-10] 11/21/2013
Rep. McMorris Rodgers, Cathy [R-WA-5] 11/21/2013
Rep. Mica, John L. [R-FL-7] 11/21/2013
Rep. Miller, Jeff [R-FL-1] 11/21/2013
Rep. Mullin, Markwayne [R-OK-2] 11/21/2013
Rep. Noem, Kristi L. [R-SD-At Large] 11/21/2013
Rep. Olson, Pete [R-TX-22] 11/21/2013
Rep. Petri, Thomas E. [R-WI-6] 11/21/2013
Rep. Pitts, Joseph R. [R-PA-16] 11/21/2013
Rep. Pompeo, Mike [R-KS-4] 11/21/2013
Rep. Rooney, Thomas J. [R-FL-17] 11/21/2013
Rep. Smith, Christopher H. [R-NJ-4] 11/21/2013
Rep. Southerland, Steve II [R-FL-2] 11/21/2013
Rep. Terry, Lee [R-NE-2] 11/21/2013
Rep. Thompson, Glenn [R-PA-5] 11/21/2013
Rep. Thornberry, Mac [R-TX-13] 11/21/2013
Rep. Wilson, Joe [R-SC-2] 11/21/2013
Rep. Young, Todd C. [R-IN-9] 11/21/2013
Rep. Roskam, Peter J. [R-IL-6] 11/21/2013
Rep. Wagner, Ann [R-MO-2] 12/05/2013
Rep. Davis, Rodney [R-IL-13] 12/05/2013
Rep. Hartzler, Vicky [R-MO-4] 12/05/2013
Rep. Huizenga, Bill [R-MI-2] 12/05/2013
Rep. Poe, Ted [R-TX-2] 12/05/2013
Rep. Forbes, J. Randy [R-VA-4] 12/05/2013
Rep. Neugebauer, Randy [R-TX-19] 12/10/2013
Rep. Rothfus, Keith J. [R-PA-12] 12/12/2013
Rep. Johnson, Bill [R-OH-6] 12/12/2013
Rep. Luetkemeyer, Blaine [R-MO-3] 01/16/2014
Rep. Broun, Paul C. [R-GA-10] 02/03/2014
Rep. Bilirakis, Gus M. [R-FL-12] 04/07/2014