Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor

CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Miller, George [D-CA-11]* 11/19/2013
Rep. Vargas, Juan [D-CA-51] 11/20/2013
Rep. Garcia, Joe [D-FL-26] 11/20/2013
Rep. Napolitano, Grace F. [D-CA-32] 11/20/2013
Rep. Green, Gene [D-TX-29] 11/20/2013
Rep. Loebsack, David [D-IA-2] 11/20/2013
Rep. Nadler, Jerrold [D-NY-10] 11/20/2013
Rep. Crowley, Joseph [D-NY-14] 11/20/2013
Rep. Jeffries, Hakeem S. [D-NY-8] 11/20/2013
Rep. Courtney, Joe [D-CT-2] 11/20/2013
Rep. Polis, Jared [D-CO-2] 11/20/2013
Rep. Cuellar, Henry [D-TX-28] 11/20/2013
Rep. Doggett, Lloyd [D-TX-35] 11/20/2013
Rep. Green, Al [D-TX-9] 11/20/2013
Rep. Lujan, Ben Ray [D-NM-3] 11/20/2013
Rep. Grijalva, Raul M. [D-AZ-3] 11/20/2013
Rep. Pierluisi, Pedro R. [D-PR-At Large] 11/21/2013
Rep. Bass, Karen [D-CA-37] 11/21/2013
Rep. Tierney, John F. [D-MA-6] 11/21/2013
Rep. Velazquez, Nydia M. [D-NY-7] 11/21/2013
Rep. Lujan Grisham, Michelle [D-NM-1] 12/04/2013
Rep. Fattah, Chaka [D-PA-2] 12/04/2013
Rep. Roybal-Allard, Lucille [D-CA-40] 12/04/2013
Rep. Cardenas, Tony [D-CA-29] 12/04/2013
Rep. Gallego, Pete P. [D-TX-23] 12/04/2013
Rep. O'Rourke, Beto [D-TX-16] 12/04/2013
Rep. Becerra, Xavier [D-CA-34] 12/11/2013
Rep. Castro, Joaquin [D-TX-20] 12/11/2013
Rep. Gutierrez, Luis V. [D-IL-4] 12/11/2013
Rep. Costa, Jim [D-CA-16] 12/11/2013
Rep. Clarke, Yvette D. [D-NY-9] 12/11/2013
Rep. Ruiz, Raul [D-CA-36] 12/11/2013
Rep. Pastor, Ed [D-AZ-7] 12/11/2013
Rep. Sanchez, Linda T. [D-CA-38] 12/11/2013
Rep. Sablan, Gregorio Kilili Camacho [D-MP-At Large] 12/11/2013
Rep. Brownley, Julia [D-CA-26] 02/03/2014
Rep. McGovern, James P. [D-MA-2] 02/03/2014
Rep. Bonamici, Suzanne [D-OR-1] 02/03/2014
Rep. Kind, Ron [D-WI-3] 02/03/2014
Rep. Cartwright, Matt [D-PA-17] 02/03/2014
Rep. Wilson, Frederica S. [D-FL-24] 02/03/2014
Rep. Negrete McLeod, Gloria [D-CA-35] 02/03/2014
Rep. Lofgren, Zoe [D-CA-19] 02/28/2014