Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor

CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Capito, Shelley Moore [R-WV-2]* 11/19/2013
Rep. Murphy, Patrick [D-FL-18]* 11/19/2013
Rep. Butterfield, G. K. [D-NC-1]* 11/19/2013
Rep. Scott, Robert C. "Bobby" [D-VA-3] 11/21/2013
Rep. Cardenas, Tony [D-CA-29] 11/21/2013
Rep. Mulvaney, Mick [R-SC-5] 11/21/2013
Rep. Kingston, Jack [R-GA-1] 11/21/2013
Rep. Bass, Karen [D-CA-37] 11/22/2013
Rep. Lummis, Cynthia M. [R-WY-At Large] 11/22/2013
Rep. Kuster, Ann M. [D-NH-2] 11/22/2013
Rep. Duncan, Jeff [R-SC-3] 11/22/2013
Rep. Lowenthal, Alan S. [D-CA-47] 12/11/2013
Rep. Hudson, Richard [R-NC-8] 12/11/2013
Rep. Cartwright, Matt [D-PA-17] 01/08/2014
Rep. Schneider, Bradley S. [D-IL-10] 01/14/2014
Rep. Cotton, Tom [R-AR-4] 01/16/2014
Rep. Meeks, Gregory W. [D-NY-5] 01/17/2014
Rep. Daines, Steve [R-MT-At Large] 01/17/2014
Rep. Barrow, John [D-GA-12] 01/17/2014
Rep. Stivers, Steve [R-OH-15] 02/03/2014
Rep. Ellmers, Renee L. [R-NC-2] 02/18/2014
Rep. LaMalfa, Doug [R-CA-1] 02/18/2014
Rep. Wittman, Robert J. [R-VA-1] 02/18/2014
Rep. Rooney, Thomas J. [R-FL-17] 02/18/2014
Rep. Flores, Bill [R-TX-17] 02/18/2014
Rep. Stutzman, Marlin A. [R-IN-3] 02/18/2014
Rep. Southerland, Steve II [R-FL-2] 02/18/2014
Rep. Brooks, Susan W. [R-IN-5] 02/18/2014
Rep. Jones, Walter B., Jr. [R-NC-3] 02/18/2014
Rep. Luetkemeyer, Blaine [R-MO-3] 02/26/2014
Rep. Fincher, Stephen Lee [R-TN-8] 02/26/2014
Rep. DeSantis, Ron [R-FL-6] 02/26/2014
Rep. Paulsen, Erik [R-MN-3] 02/26/2014
Rep. Bachmann, Michele [R-MN-6] 02/26/2014
Rep. Pittenger, Robert [R-NC-9] 02/27/2014
Rep. Wilson, Joe [R-SC-2] 02/28/2014
Rep. Long, Billy [R-MO-7] 03/04/2014
Rep. Collins, Doug [R-GA-9] 03/04/2014
Rep. Roe, David P. [R-TN-1] 03/04/2014
Rep. King, Peter T. [R-NY-2] 03/05/2014
Rep. Rokita, Todd [R-IN-4] 03/12/2014
Rep. Hartzler, Vicky [R-MO-4] 03/26/2014
Rep. Young, Don [R-AK-At Large] 04/01/2014
Rep. Cooper, Jim [D-TN-5] 04/02/2014
Rep. Gardner, Cory [R-CO-4] 04/07/2014