Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor

CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Engel, Eliot L. [D-NY-16]* 11/18/2013
Rep. Matheson, Jim [D-UT-4]* 11/18/2013
Rep. Roskam, Peter J. [R-IL-6]* 11/18/2013
Rep. King, Steve [R-IA-4]* 11/18/2013
Rep. Christensen, Donna M. [D-VI-At Large] 11/19/2013
Rep. Fortenberry, Jeff [R-NE-1] 11/19/2013
Rep. Burgess, Michael C. [R-TX-26] 12/09/2013
Rep. Green, Gene [D-TX-29] 12/10/2013
Rep. Schakowsky, Janice D. [D-IL-9] 01/07/2014