Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor

CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Thornberry, Mac [R-TX-13]* 01/23/2013
Rep. Duncan, John J., Jr. [R-TN-2]* 01/23/2013
Rep. Griffith, H. Morgan [R-VA-9]* 01/23/2013
Rep. McIntyre, Mike [D-NC-7]* 01/23/2013
Rep. Coffman, Mike [R-CO-6]* 01/23/2013
Rep. Westmoreland, Lynn A. [R-GA-3]* 01/23/2013
Rep. Burgess, Michael C. [R-TX-26]* 01/23/2013
Rep. Sensenbrenner, F. James, Jr. [R-WI-5]* 01/23/2013
Rep. Simpson, Michael K. [R-ID-2]* 01/23/2013
Rep. Bachus, Spencer [R-AL-6]* 01/23/2013
Rep. Wittman, Robert J. [R-VA-1]* 01/23/2013
Rep. Broun, Paul C. [R-GA-10]* 01/23/2013
Rep. Bishop, Rob [R-UT-1]* 01/23/2013
Rep. McMorris Rodgers, Cathy [R-WA-5]* 01/23/2013
Rep. Scalise, Steve [R-LA-1]* 01/23/2013
Rep. Luetkemeyer, Blaine [R-MO-3]* 01/23/2013
Rep. Forbes, J. Randy [R-VA-4]* 01/23/2013
Rep. Long, Billy [R-MO-7]* 01/23/2013
Rep. Hastings, Doc [R-WA-4]* 01/23/2013
Rep. McKeon, Howard P. "Buck" [R-CA-25]* 01/23/2013
Rep. Issa, Darrell E. [R-CA-49]* 01/23/2013
Rep. Lucas, Frank D. [R-OK-3]* 01/23/2013
Rep. Upton, Fred [R-MI-6]* 01/23/2013
Rep. Walden, Greg [R-OR-2]* 01/23/2013
Rep. Miller, Jeff [R-FL-1]* 01/23/2013
Rep. Kline, John [R-MN-2]* 01/23/2013
Rep. McCarthy, Kevin [R-CA-23]* 01/23/2013
Rep. Rogers, Mike J. [R-MI-8]* 01/23/2013
Rep. McHenry, Patrick T. [R-NC-10]* 01/23/2013
Rep. King, Steve [R-IA-4]* 01/23/2013
Rep. Johnson, Bill [R-OH-6]* 01/23/2013
Rep. Posey, Bill [R-FL-8]* 01/23/2013
Rep. Lamborn, Doug [R-CO-5]* 01/23/2013
Rep. Rogers, Harold [R-KY-5]* 01/23/2013
Rep. Kingston, Jack [R-GA-1]* 01/23/2013
Rep. Jordan, Jim [R-OH-4]* 01/23/2013
Rep. Bonner, Jo [R-AL-1]* 01/23/2013
Rep. Pitts, Joseph R. [R-PA-16]* 01/23/2013
Rep. Campbell, John [R-CA-45]* 01/23/2013
Rep. Carter, John R. [R-TX-31]* 01/23/2013
Rep. Fleming, John [R-LA-4]* 01/23/2013
Rep. Mica, John L. [R-FL-7]* 01/23/2013
Rep. Shimkus, John [R-IL-15]* 01/23/2013
Rep. Calvert, Ken [R-CA-42]* 01/23/2013
Rep. Marchant, Kenny [R-TX-24]* 01/23/2013
Rep. Brady, Kevin [R-TX-8]* 01/23/2013
Rep. Terry, Lee [R-NE-2]* 01/23/2013
Rep. Gohmert, Louie [R-TX-1]* 01/23/2013
Rep. Blackburn, Marsha [R-TN-7]* 01/23/2013
Rep. Conaway, K. Michael [R-TX-11]* 01/23/2013
Rep. Bachmann, Michele [R-MN-6]* 01/23/2013
Rep. Rogers, Mike D. [R-AL-3]* 01/23/2013
Rep. Gingrey, Phil [R-GA-11]* 01/23/2013
Rep. Roe, David P. [R-TN-1]* 01/23/2013
Rep. Neugebauer, Randy [R-TX-19]* 01/23/2013
Rep. Woodall, Rob [R-GA-7]* 01/23/2013
Rep. Hurt, Robert [R-VA-5]* 01/23/2013
Rep. Latta, Robert E. [R-OH-5]* 01/23/2013
Rep. Garrett, Scott [R-NJ-5]* 01/23/2013
Rep. Walberg, Tim [R-MI-7]* 01/23/2013
Rep. Latham, Tom [R-IA-4]* 01/23/2013
Rep. McClintock, Tom [R-CA-4]* 01/23/2013
Rep. Price, Tom [R-GA-6]* 01/23/2013
Rep. Franks, Trent [R-AZ-2]* 01/23/2013
Rep. Weber, Randy K. Sr. [R-TX-14]* 01/23/2013
Rep. Amodei, Mark E. [R-NV-2]* 01/23/2013
Rep. Benishek, Dan [R-MI-1]* 01/23/2013
Rep. Boustany, Charles W., Jr. [R-LA-3]* 01/23/2013
Rep. Peterson, Collin C. [D-MN-7] 01/25/2013
Rep. Hensarling, Jeb [R-TX-5] 02/05/2013
Rep. DeSantis, Ron [R-FL-6] 02/14/2013
Rep. Schweikert, David [R-AZ-6] 02/14/2013
Rep. Bentivolio, Kerry L. [R-MI-11] 02/14/2013
Rep. LaMalfa, Doug [R-CA-1] 02/14/2013
Rep. Hunter, Duncan D. [R-CA-50] 04/09/2013
Rep. Rokita, Todd [R-IN-4] 04/09/2013
Rep. Collins, Chris [R-NY-27] 04/18/2013
Rep. Culberson, John Abney [R-TX-7] 06/06/2013
Rep. Webster, Daniel [R-FL-10] 06/11/2013
Rep. Wilson, Joe [R-SC-2] 06/12/2013
Rep. McKinley, David B. [R-WV-1] 06/12/2013
Rep. Mulvaney, Mick [R-SC-5] 06/12/2013
Rep. Barton, Joe [R-TX-6] 06/12/2013
Rep. Chabot, Steve [R-OH-1] 06/12/2013
Rep. Pearce, Stevan [R-NM-2] 06/18/2013
Rep. Aderholt, Robert B. [R-AL-4] 07/09/2013
Rep. Diaz-Balart, Mario [R-FL-25] 07/09/2013
Rep. Chaffetz, Jason [R-UT-3] 07/09/2013
Rep. Womack, Steve [R-AR-3] 07/09/2013
Rep. McCaul, Michael T. [R-TX-10] 07/10/2013
Rep. Amash, Justin [R-MI-3] 07/10/2013
Rep. Huelskamp, Tim [R-KS-1] 07/10/2013
Rep. Brooks, Mo [R-AL-5] 07/10/2013
Rep. Lummis, Cynthia M. [R-WY-At Large] 07/10/2013
Rep. Yoder, Kevin [R-KS-3] 07/10/2013
Rep. Stockman, Steve [R-TX-36] 07/10/2013
Rep. Alexander, Rodney [R-LA-5] 07/10/2013
Rep. Gowdy, Trey [R-SC-4] 07/10/2013
Rep. Harris, Andy [R-MD-1] 07/10/2013
Rep. Smith, Lamar [R-TX-21] 07/10/2013
Rep. Sessions, Pete [R-TX-32] 07/30/2013
Rep. Stewart, Chris [R-UT-2] 01/16/2014
Rep. Jones, Walter B., Jr. [R-NC-3] 01/29/2014
Rep. Scott, Austin [R-GA-8] 02/03/2014
Rep. Bilirakis, Gus M. [R-FL-12] 04/08/2014
Rep. Bridenstine, Jim [R-OK-1] 04/08/2014
Rep. Graves, Tom [R-GA-14] 04/08/2014
Rep. Hall, Ralph M. [R-TX-4] 04/08/2014
Rep. Hudson, Richard [R-NC-8] 04/08/2014
Rep. Massie, Thomas [R-KY-4] 04/08/2014
Rep. Meadows, Mark [R-NC-11] 04/08/2014
Rep. Messer, Luke [R-IN-6] 04/08/2014
Rep. Farenthold, Blake [R-TX-27] 04/09/2014
Rep. Ribble, Reid J. [R-WI-8] 04/09/2014
Rep. Huizenga, Bill [R-MI-2] 04/09/2014
Rep. Poe, Ted [R-TX-2] 04/09/2014
Rep. Yoho, Ted S. [R-FL-3] 04/09/2014