Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor

CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Lance, Leonard [R-NJ-7]* 01/23/2013
Rep. LoBiondo, Frank A. [R-NJ-2] 03/20/2013
Rep. Frelinghuysen, Rodney P. [R-NJ-11] 05/23/2013
Rep. Smith, Christopher H. [R-NJ-4] 07/18/2013
Rep. Runyan, Jon [R-NJ-3] 10/29/2013