Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor

CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Franks, Trent [R-AZ-8]* 01/23/2013
Rep. Gosar, Paul A. [R-AZ-4]* 01/23/2013
Rep. Barber, Ron [D-AZ-2] 05/14/2013
Rep. Sinema, Kyrsten [D-AZ-9] 06/17/2013
Rep. Kirkpatrick, Ann [D-AZ-1] 07/18/2013
Rep. Schweikert, David [R-AZ-6] 10/29/2013
Rep. Salmon, Matt [R-AZ-5] 11/18/2013