Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor

CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Dent, Charles W. [R-PA-15]* 01/23/2013
Rep. Fitzpatrick, Michael G. [R-PA-8]* 01/23/2013
Rep. Gerlach, Jim [R-PA-6]* 01/23/2013
Rep. Meehan, Patrick [R-PA-7]* 01/23/2013
Rep. Murphy, Tim [R-PA-18]* 01/23/2013
Rep. Thompson, Glenn [R-PA-5]* 01/23/2013
Rep. Perry, Scott [R-PA-4] 02/06/2013
Rep. Barletta, Lou [R-PA-11] 02/25/2013
Rep. Rothfus, Keith J. [R-PA-12] 04/23/2013
Rep. Marino, Tom [R-PA-10] 10/29/2013
Rep. Kelly, Mike [R-PA-3] 10/29/2013
Rep. Shuster, Bill [R-PA-9] 11/12/2013