Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor

CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Bishop, Timothy H. [D-NY-1]* 01/23/2013
Rep. Hanna, Richard L. [R-NY-22]* 01/23/2013
Rep. Reed, Tom [R-NY-23]* 01/23/2013
Rep. McCarthy, Carolyn [D-NY-4] 02/25/2013
Rep. Grimm, Michael G. [R-NY-11] 03/04/2013
Rep. Maloney, Sean Patrick [D-NY-18] 03/12/2013
Rep. Collins, Chris [R-NY-27] 03/13/2013
Rep. Maffei, Daniel B. [D-NY-24] 04/09/2013
Rep. King, Peter T. [R-NY-2] 04/23/2013