Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor

CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Jones, Walter B., Jr. [R-NC-3]* 01/23/2013
Rep. Pittenger, Robert [R-NC-9] 02/06/2013
Rep. Ellmers, Renee L. [R-NC-2] 02/06/2013
Rep. McIntyre, Mike [D-NC-7] 02/08/2013
Rep. Holding, George [R-NC-13] 02/25/2013
Rep. Meadows, Mark [R-NC-11] 02/25/2013
Rep. Hudson, Richard [R-NC-8] 03/25/2013
Rep. McHenry, Patrick T. [R-NC-10] 05/08/2013
Rep. Coble, Howard [R-NC-6] 10/29/2013