Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor

CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Gingrey, Phil [R-GA-11]* 01/23/2013
Rep. Price, Tom [R-GA-6]* 01/23/2013
Rep. Westmoreland, Lynn A. [R-GA-3]* 01/23/2013
Rep. Kingston, Jack [R-GA-1] 02/06/2013
Rep. Scott, Austin [R-GA-8] 02/06/2013
Rep. Broun, Paul C. [R-GA-10] 02/08/2013
Rep. Barrow, John [D-GA-12] 03/13/2013
Rep. Scott, David [D-GA-13] 04/12/2013
Rep. Collins, Doug [R-GA-9] 05/06/2013
Rep. Graves, Tom [R-GA-14] 05/14/2013