Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor

CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Bilirakis, Gus M. [R-FL-12]* 01/23/2013
Rep. Buchanan, Vern [R-FL-16]* 01/23/2013
Rep. Miller, Jeff [R-FL-1]* 01/23/2013
Rep. Nugent, Richard B. [R-FL-11]* 01/23/2013
Rep. Posey, Bill [R-FL-8]* 01/23/2013
Rep. Webster, Daniel [R-FL-10]* 01/23/2013
Rep. Young, C. W. Bill [R-FL-13]* 01/23/2013
Rep. Ross, Dennis A. [R-FL-15] 02/06/2013
Rep. DeSantis, Ron [R-FL-6] 04/25/2013
Rep. Yoho, Ted S. [R-FL-3] 05/06/2013
Rep. Crenshaw, Ander [R-FL-4] 05/23/2013
Rep. Radel, Trey [R-FL-19] 06/28/2013
Rep. Diaz-Balart, Mario [R-FL-25] 11/13/2013