Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor

CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Coble, Howard [R-NC-6]* 11/14/2013
Rep. McCaul, Michael T. [R-TX-10]* 11/14/2013
Rep. DeFazio, Peter A. [D-OR-4]* 11/14/2013
Rep. Titus, Dina [D-NV-1] 11/21/2013
Rep. Pocan, Mark [D-WI-2] 11/21/2013
Rep. Sires, Albio [D-NJ-8] 11/21/2013
Rep. Pingree, Chellie [D-ME-1] 12/04/2013
Rep. Nadler, Jerrold [D-NY-10] 12/04/2013
Rep. Connolly, Gerald E. [D-VA-11] 12/04/2013
Rep. DelBene, Suzan K. [D-WA-1] 12/04/2013
Rep. Brownley, Julia [D-CA-26] 12/04/2013
Rep. Moran, James P. [D-VA-8] 12/04/2013
Rep. Huffman, Jared [D-CA-2] 12/04/2013
Rep. Vela, Filemon [D-TX-34] 12/04/2013
Rep. Lujan, Ben Ray [D-NM-3] 12/04/2013
Rep. Tierney, John F. [D-MA-6] 12/04/2013
Rep. Capuano, Michael E. [D-MA-7] 12/04/2013
Rep. Larsen, Rick [D-WA-2] 12/04/2013
Rep. Schakowsky, Janice D. [D-IL-9] 12/09/2013
Rep. Cohen, Steve [D-TN-9] 12/09/2013
Rep. Polis, Jared [D-CO-2] 12/09/2013
Rep. McGovern, James P. [D-MA-2] 12/09/2013
Rep. Michaud, Michael H. [D-ME-2] 12/09/2013
Rep. McKinley, David B. [R-WV-1] 12/11/2013
Rep. Bustos, Cheri [D-IL-17] 12/11/2013
Rep. Van Hollen, Chris [D-MD-8] 12/11/2013
Rep. Owens, William L. [D-NY-21] 12/11/2013
Rep. Lofgren, Zoe [D-CA-19] 12/11/2013
Rep. Doyle, Michael F. [D-PA-14] 12/12/2013
Rep. Smith, Adam [D-WA-9] 12/16/2013
Rep. Norton, Eleanor Holmes [D-DC-At Large] 12/19/2013
Rep. Ellison, Keith [D-MN-5] 01/03/2014
Rep. Price, David E. [D-NC-4] 01/03/2014
Rep. Waxman, Henry A. [D-CA-33] 01/03/2014
Rep. Roskam, Peter J. [R-IL-6] 01/08/2014
Rep. O'Rourke, Beto [D-TX-16] 01/10/2014
Rep. Peters, Scott H. [D-CA-52] 01/10/2014
Rep. Tsongas, Niki [D-MA-3] 01/10/2014
Rep. Honda, Michael M. [D-CA-17] 01/10/2014
Rep. Schneider, Bradley S. [D-IL-10] 01/13/2014
Rep. McCollum, Betty [D-MN-4] 01/13/2014
Rep. Walz, Timothy J. [D-MN-1] 01/15/2014
Rep. Speier, Jackie [D-CA-14] 01/27/2014
Rep. Schiff, Adam B. [D-CA-28] 01/27/2014
Rep. Holt, Rush [D-NJ-12] 01/27/2014
Rep. McDermott, Jim [D-WA-7] 01/29/2014
Rep. Lee, Barbara [D-CA-13] 01/29/2014
Rep. Grijalva, Raul M. [D-AZ-3] 01/29/2014
Rep. Lowenthal, Alan S. [D-CA-47] 01/29/2014
Rep. Keating, William R. [D-MA-9] 02/03/2014
Rep. Kuster, Ann M. [D-NH-2] 02/03/2014
Rep. Cleaver, Emanuel [D-MO-5] 02/03/2014
Rep. Farr, Sam [D-CA-20] 02/03/2014
Rep. Garamendi, John [D-CA-3] 02/14/2014
Rep. Capps, Lois [D-CA-24] 02/25/2014
Rep. Bonamici, Suzanne [D-OR-1] 02/27/2014
Rep. Clark, Katherine M. [D-MA-5] 02/27/2014
Rep. Matsui, Doris O. [D-CA-6] 03/06/2014
Rep. Gibson, Christopher P. [R-NY-19] 03/06/2014
Rep. Matheson, Jim [D-UT-4] 03/11/2014
Rep. Enyart, William L. [D-IL-12] 03/11/2014
Rep. Slaughter, Louise McIntosh [D-NY-28] 03/11/2014
Rep. Quigley, Mike [D-IL-5] 03/13/2014
Rep. Moore, Gwen [D-WI-4] 03/13/2014
Rep. Cicilline, David N. [D-RI-1] 03/13/2014
Rep. Scott, Robert C. "Bobby" [D-VA-3] 03/13/2014
Rep. Neal, Richard E. [D-MA-1] 03/24/2014
Rep. Shea-Porter, Carol [D-NH-1] 03/24/2014
Rep. Tonko, Paul [D-NY-20] 03/24/2014
Rep. Himes, James A. [D-CT-4] 03/24/2014
Rep. Fortenberry, Jeff [R-NE-1] 03/24/2014
Rep. Crowley, Joseph [D-NY-14] 03/24/2014
Rep. Carney, John C., Jr. [D-DE-At Large] 03/24/2014
Rep. Frelinghuysen, Rodney P. [R-NJ-11] 04/01/2014
Rep. Peterson, Collin C. [D-MN-7] 04/01/2014
Rep. Langevin, James R. [D-RI-2] 04/01/2014
Rep. Veasey, Marc A. [D-TX-33] 04/01/2014
Rep. Kennedy, Joseph P. III [D-MA-4] 04/04/2014
Rep. Loebsack, David [D-IA-2] 04/10/2014