Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor

CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Clay, Wm. Lacy [D-MO-1]* 11/14/2013
Rep. McGovern, James P. [D-MA-2] 11/19/2013
Rep. Norton, Eleanor Holmes [D-DC-At Large] 11/19/2013
Rep. Hanna, Richard L. [R-NY-22] 11/19/2013
Rep. Capuano, Michael E. [D-MA-7] 11/21/2013
Rep. Price, David E. [D-NC-4] 11/21/2013
Rep. Farenthold, Blake [R-TX-27] 11/21/2013
Rep. Vargas, Juan [D-CA-51] 12/02/2013
Rep. Honda, Michael M. [D-CA-17] 12/02/2013
Rep. Peters, Scott H. [D-CA-52] 12/02/2013
Rep. Esty, Elizabeth H. [D-CT-5] 12/03/2013
Rep. Long, Billy [R-MO-7] 12/03/2013
Rep. Smith, Jason T. [R-MO-8] 12/09/2013
Rep. Cartwright, Matt [D-PA-17] 12/09/2013
Rep. Tsongas, Niki [D-MA-3] 12/09/2013
Rep. Thompson, Glenn [R-PA-5] 12/09/2013
Rep. Cohen, Steve [D-TN-9] 12/09/2013
Rep. Loebsack, David [D-IA-2] 12/09/2013
Rep. Lowenthal, Alan S. [D-CA-47] 12/09/2013
Rep. Ros-Lehtinen, Ileana [R-FL-27] 12/12/2013
Rep. Davis, Rodney [R-IL-13] 12/12/2013
Rep. Gerlach, Jim [R-PA-6] 12/12/2013
Rep. Garcia, Joe [D-FL-26] 12/12/2013
Rep. Frankel, Lois [D-FL-22] 12/12/2013
Rep. Huffman, Jared [D-CA-2] 12/16/2013
Rep. Bonamici, Suzanne [D-OR-1] 12/16/2013
Rep. Meng, Grace [D-NY-6] 12/16/2013
Rep. Schneider, Bradley S. [D-IL-10] 01/07/2014
Rep. Capps, Lois [D-CA-24] 01/07/2014
Rep. Diaz-Balart, Mario [R-FL-25] 01/07/2014
Rep. Rigell, E. Scott [R-VA-2] 01/07/2014
Rep. Murphy, Tim [R-PA-18] 01/07/2014
Rep. Gibson, Christopher P. [R-NY-19] 01/07/2014
Rep. Titus, Dina [D-NV-1] 01/07/2014
Rep. Reed, Tom [R-NY-23] 01/07/2014
Rep. Connolly, Gerald E. [D-VA-11] 01/27/2014
Rep. Schiff, Adam B. [D-CA-28] 03/11/2014
Rep. McDermott, Jim [D-WA-7] 03/26/2014
Rep. LoBiondo, Frank A. [R-NJ-2] 03/26/2014