Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor

CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Bachmann, Michele [R-MN-6]* 11/14/2013
Rep. Bishop, Rob [R-UT-1]* 11/14/2013
Rep. Blackburn, Marsha [R-TN-7]* 11/14/2013
Rep. Bucshon, Larry [R-IN-8]* 11/14/2013
Rep. Cassidy, Bill [R-LA-6]* 11/14/2013
Rep. Chabot, Steve [R-OH-1]* 11/14/2013
Rep. Cole, Tom [R-OK-4]* 11/14/2013
Rep. Crawford, Eric A. "Rick" [R-AR-1]* 11/14/2013
Rep. Crenshaw, Ander [R-FL-4]* 11/14/2013
Rep. Duncan, Jeff [R-SC-3]* 11/14/2013
Rep. Fleming, John [R-LA-4]* 11/14/2013
Rep. Flores, Bill [R-TX-17]* 11/14/2013
Rep. Franks, Trent [R-AZ-8]* 11/14/2013
Rep. Gingrey, Phil [R-GA-11]* 11/14/2013
Rep. Harper, Gregg [R-MS-3]* 11/14/2013
Rep. Hudson, Richard [R-NC-8]* 11/14/2013
Rep. Huelskamp, Tim [R-KS-1]* 11/14/2013
Rep. Jenkins, Lynn [R-KS-2]* 11/14/2013
Rep. Johnson, Sam [R-TX-3]* 11/14/2013
Rep. Kingston, Jack [R-GA-1]* 11/14/2013
Rep. King, Steve [R-IA-4]* 11/14/2013
Rep. LaMalfa, Doug [R-CA-1]* 11/14/2013
Rep. Marchant, Kenny [R-TX-24]* 11/14/2013
Rep. Mulvaney, Mick [R-SC-5]* 11/14/2013
Rep. Olson, Pete [R-TX-22]* 11/14/2013
Rep. Pittenger, Robert [R-NC-9]* 11/14/2013
Rep. Pitts, Joseph R. [R-PA-16]* 11/14/2013
Rep. Radel, Trey [R-FL-19]* 11/14/2013
Rep. Ribble, Reid J. [R-WI-8]* 11/14/2013
Rep. Ross, Dennis A. [R-FL-15]* 11/14/2013
Rep. Salmon, Matt [R-AZ-5]* 11/14/2013
Rep. Sessions, Pete [R-TX-32]* 11/14/2013
Rep. Westmoreland, Lynn A. [R-GA-3]* 11/14/2013
Rep. Wilson, Joe [R-SC-2]* 11/14/2013
Rep. Yoho, Ted S. [R-FL-3]* 11/14/2013
Rep. Harris, Andy [R-MD-1] 11/15/2013
Rep. Rokita, Todd [R-IN-4] 11/15/2013
Rep. Pearce, Stevan [R-NM-2] 11/15/2013
Rep. Southerland, Steve II [R-FL-2] 11/15/2013
Rep. Buchanan, Vern [R-FL-16] 11/18/2013
Rep. Gardner, Cory [R-CO-4] 11/18/2013
Rep. McCaul, Michael T. [R-TX-10] 11/18/2013
Rep. Broun, Paul C. [R-GA-10] 11/19/2013
Rep. Woodall, Rob [R-GA-7] 11/19/2013
Rep. Thornberry, Mac [R-TX-13] 11/19/2013
Rep. DeSantis, Ron [R-FL-6] 11/20/2013
Rep. Bentivolio, Kerry L. [R-MI-11] 11/20/2013
Rep. Poe, Ted [R-TX-2] 11/20/2013
Rep. Gosar, Paul A. [R-AZ-4] 11/20/2013
Rep. Latta, Robert E. [R-OH-5] 11/20/2013
Rep. Nunnelee, Alan [R-MS-1] 11/20/2013
Rep. Lankford, James [R-OK-5] 11/20/2013
Rep. Fleischmann, Charles J. "Chuck" [R-TN-3] 11/20/2013
Rep. Culberson, John Abney [R-TX-7] 11/21/2013
Rep. Schweikert, David [R-AZ-6] 11/21/2013
Rep. Brooks, Mo [R-AL-5] 11/21/2013
Rep. Burgess, Michael C. [R-TX-26] 11/21/2013
Rep. Womack, Steve [R-AR-3] 11/21/2013
Rep. Hartzler, Vicky [R-MO-4] 12/02/2013
Rep. Farenthold, Blake [R-TX-27] 12/02/2013
Rep. Fincher, Stephen Lee [R-TN-8] 12/03/2013
Rep. DesJarlais, Scott [R-TN-4] 12/03/2013
Rep. Goodlatte, Bob [R-VA-6] 12/04/2013
Rep. Miller, Jeff [R-FL-1] 12/04/2013
Rep. Graves, Tom [R-GA-14] 12/05/2013
Rep. Lummis, Cynthia M. [R-WY-At Large] 12/12/2013
Rep. Foxx, Virginia [R-NC-5] 12/12/2013
Rep. Holding, George [R-NC-13] 12/16/2013
Rep. Stewart, Chris [R-UT-2] 01/07/2014
Rep. Stutzman, Marlin A. [R-IN-3] 01/09/2014
Rep. Wagner, Ann [R-MO-2] 01/13/2014
Rep. Meadows, Mark [R-NC-11] 01/17/2014
Rep. Labrador, Raul R. [R-ID-1] 01/17/2014
Rep. Gowdy, Trey [R-SC-4] 01/27/2014
Rep. Rooney, Thomas J. [R-FL-17] 01/27/2014
Rep. Scott, Austin [R-GA-8] 01/28/2014
Rep. Barr, Andy [R-KY-6] 01/31/2014
Rep. Coffman, Mike [R-CO-6] 02/03/2014
Rep. Perry, Scott [R-PA-4] 02/03/2014
Rep. Smith, Lamar [R-TX-21] 02/10/2014
Rep. Yoder, Kevin [R-KS-3] 02/11/2014
Rep. Griffin, Tim [R-AR-2] 03/04/2014
Rep. Walorski, Jackie [R-IN-2] 03/11/2014
Rep. Hensarling, Jeb [R-TX-5] 03/11/2014
Rep. Hultgren, Randy [R-IL-14] 03/11/2014
Rep. Messer, Luke [R-IN-6] 03/12/2014
Rep. Cotton, Tom [R-AR-4] 03/25/2014
Rep. Byrne, Bradley [R-AL-1] 04/01/2014
Rep. Forbes, J. Randy [R-VA-4] 04/01/2014