Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor

CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Flores, Bill [R-TX-17]* 11/14/2013
Rep. Johnson, Sam [R-TX-3]* 11/14/2013
Rep. Marchant, Kenny [R-TX-24]* 11/14/2013
Rep. Olson, Pete [R-TX-22]* 11/14/2013
Rep. Sessions, Pete [R-TX-32]* 11/14/2013
Rep. McCaul, Michael T. [R-TX-10] 11/18/2013
Rep. Thornberry, Mac [R-TX-13] 11/19/2013
Rep. Poe, Ted [R-TX-2] 11/20/2013
Rep. Culberson, John Abney [R-TX-7] 11/21/2013
Rep. Burgess, Michael C. [R-TX-26] 11/21/2013
Rep. Farenthold, Blake [R-TX-27] 12/02/2013
Rep. Smith, Lamar [R-TX-21] 02/10/2014
Rep. Hensarling, Jeb [R-TX-5] 03/11/2014